Global Patent Index - EP 2156241 A1

EP 2156241 A1 2010-02-24 - SELF-CLEARING LIGHT-PROTECTIVE DEVICE

Title (en)

SELF-CLEARING LIGHT-PROTECTIVE DEVICE

Title (de)

AUFHELLENDE LICHTSCHUTZVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ÉCLAIRCISSANT DE PROTECTION CONTRE LA LUMIÈRE

Publication

EP 2156241 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 08757248 A

Priority

  • CH 2008000255 W
  • CH 9142007 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2008148240A1] The invention relates to a light-protective device (1) and the operation thereof with at least one active eye protector glass (3) comprising at least one light sensor (7) and control electronics (8) fed from a power supply. The control electronics (8) control the transmission (T) of the eye protector glass (3) such that, in bright surroundings, the eye protector glass (3) is darkened with no or very little electricity use and absolutely without flickering, while said glass is cleared in dim surroundings with applied voltage.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02C 7/10 (2006.01); A61F 9/02 (2006.01); A61F 9/06 (2006.01); G02F 1/133 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02C 7/101 (2013.01); A61F 9/023 (2013.01); G02F 1/13318 (2013.01); G09G 2360/144 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2008148240A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2008148240 A1 20081211; EP 2156241 A1 20100224

INPADOC legal status


2016-03-16 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20160121

2016-01-21 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2011-03-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110127

2010-09-15 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2010-02-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20091208

2010-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-02-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS