Global Patent Index - EP 2157258 A2

EP 2157258 A2 2010-02-24 - Material board containing concrete with a mobile bearing and method for producing same

Title (en)

Material board containing concrete with a mobile bearing and method for producing same

Title (de)

Beweglich gelagerte zementhaltige Werkstoffplatte und Verfahren zur Herstellung derselben

Title (fr)

Plaque de matière active contenant du ciment agencée de manière mobile et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 2157258 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 09010263 A

Priority

DE 102008038919 A

Abstract (en)

The plate has a cement-containing material layer (7), and a foil layer (4) arranged between a ground line (3) and an insulation layer (6). A sliding medium (5) e.g. PTFE and soft soap, is arranged over the foil layer and provided for horizontal movable mounting of the material layer supported by the insulation layer. A humidity layer is attached on the foil layer, and the sliding medium is applied over the humidity layer. The insulation layer exhibits the sliding medium on a side turned towards the foil layer. The foil layer consists of polyethylene foil or PTFE foil. An independent claim is also included for a method for manufacturing a material plate.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung stellt eine horizontal beweglich gelagerte zementhaltige Werkstoffplatte bereit, deren Aufbau ein Planum (3), eine Dämmschicht (6) und zumindest eine zementhaltige Werkstoffschicht umfasst. Zwischen dem Planum (3) und der Dämmschicht (6) ist eine erste Folienschicht (4) angeordnet und über der ersten Folienschicht (4) ist ein die Dämmschicht (6) und die über der Dämmschicht liegende zementhaltige Werkstoffschicht horizontal beweglich auf der ersten Folienschicht (4) lagerndes Medium bereit gestellt. Ferner wird ein Verfahren zur Herstellung der horizontal gelagerten zementhaltigen Werkstoffplatte offenbart.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/12 (2006.01); E04F 15/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/18 (2013.01); E04F 15/12 (2013.01); E04F 15/182 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2157258 A2 20100224; EP 2157258 A3 20110727; DE 102008038919 A1 20100225; DE 102008038919 B4 20160331

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20170620

2017-03-08 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170209

2016-12-07 [INTC] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT (DELETED)

2016-06-22 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20160524

2015-06-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20150526

2013-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WEWATON GMBH

2012-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20120127

2011-10-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEIDELBERGCEMENT AG

2011-10-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WEWATON GMBH

2011-07-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR

2011-07-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA RS

2010-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR

2010-02-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA RS