Global Patent Index - EP 2157671 A1

EP 2157671 A1 2010-02-24 - Apparatus and method of zeroing a test instrument

Title (en)

Apparatus and method of zeroing a test instrument

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Nullstellung eines Prüfinstruments

Title (fr)

Appareil et procédé de remise à zéro d'un instrument de test

Publication

EP 2157671 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 08162636 A

Priority

EP 08162636 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus and method for shorting together a plurality of electrical leads. The apparatus includes an electrical conductor that extends between first and second ends and a first surface and a second surface facing away from the first surface. The electrical conductor includes a central bight that is disposed between the first and second ends and has a concave contour that defines a portion of the first surface. The electrical conductor also includes first and second bights that have convex contours that define portions of the first surface. The first bight is disposed between the central bight and the first end and the second bight is disposed between the central bight and the second end. The electrical conductor also includes a first and second contact segments that are respectively disposed between the first and second bights and the first and second ends.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 31/08 (2006.01); H01R 4/48 (2006.01); H01R 4/66 (2006.01); H01R 13/703 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 31/08 (2013.01); H01R 4/4809 (2013.01); H01R 4/66 (2013.01); H01R 13/7032 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2157671 A1 20100224

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20170301

2016-05-25 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20160429

2010-10-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2010-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100427

2010-04-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20100312

2010-02-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-02-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS