Global Patent Index - EP 2178162 A1

EP 2178162 A1 20100421 - A planar antenna

Title (en)

A planar antenna

Title (de)

Planare Antenne

Title (fr)

Antenne planaire

Publication

EP 2178162 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 08167066 A

Priority

EP 08167066 A

Abstract (en)

An antenna is disclosed. In one embodiment, the antenna comprises a driver comprising a folded dipole and an integral balun coupled to the folded dipole.

IPC 8 full level

H01Q 1/38 (2006.01); H01Q 3/26 (2006.01); H01Q 9/16 (2006.01); H01Q 9/26 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP)

H01Q 1/38 (2013.01); H01Q 3/26 (2013.01); H01Q 9/16 (2013.01); H01Q 9/26 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 4825220 A 19890425 - EDWARD BRIAN J [US], et al

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 2006001572 A1 20060105 - GAUCHER BRIAN P [US], et al
  • [X] US 2004196202 A1 20041007 - SHIROSAKA TOSHIAKI [JP], et al
  • [X] EP 1263085 A1 20021204 - THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR]
  • [X] SONG H J ET AL: "Investigations into the operation of a microstrip-fed uniplanar quasi-yagi antenna", ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM, 2000. IEEE JULY 16-21, 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, vol. 3, 16 July 2000 (2000-07-16), pages 1436 - 1439, XP010515178, ISBN: 978-0-7803-6369-4
  • [X] GRAJEK P R ET AL: "A 24-GHz High-Gain Yagi-Uda Antenna Array", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, vol. 52, no. 5, 1 May 2004 (2004-05-01), pages 1257 - 1261, XP011112435, ISSN: 0018-926X
  • [X] CHEUNSOO HA ET AL: "A modified quasi-yagi planar antenna with wideband characteristics in c-band", IEEE ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM. 2001 DIGEST. APS. BOSTON, MA, JULY 8 - 13, 2001; [IEEE ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, vol. 3, 8 July 2001 (2001-07-08), pages 154 - 157, XP010564253, ISBN: 978-0-7803-7070-8

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

DOCDB simple family (publication)

EP 2178162 A1 20100421

DOCDB simple family (application)

EP 08167066 A 20081020