Global Patent Index - EP 2181042 A4

EP 2181042 A4 2013-09-11 - PACKAGING MACHINE FOR BLOCK BOTTOM BAGS

Title (en)

PACKAGING MACHINE FOR BLOCK BOTTOM BAGS

Title (de)

VERPACKUNGSMASCHINE FÜR BLOCKBODENBEUTEL

Title (fr)

MACHINE D'EMBALLAGE POUR SACS À FOND PLAT

Publication

EP 2181042 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 08772654 A

Priority

  • AU 2008001028 W
  • AU 2007904567 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2009023894A1] A rotary packaging machine (10) that receives tubular bag material and moves the tubular bag material in a direction (11). Product is delivered to the interior of the tubular bag material with the bag material then being sealed and cut to form bags of the product. The machine (10) has a jaw carriage (14) that is reciprocated while the jaws (29) are rotated.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/12 (2006.01); B29C 65/00 (2006.01); B29C 65/02 (2006.01); B65B 1/02 (2006.01); B65B 5/02 (2006.01); B65B 9/20 (2012.01); B65B 51/14 (2006.01); B65B 51/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 31/08 (2013.01); B29C 65/02 (2013.01); B29C 66/1122 (2013.01); B29C 66/4312 (2013.01); B29C 66/81433 (2013.01); B29C 66/83513 (2013.01); B29C 66/83543 (2013.01); B29C 66/8491 (2013.01); B65B 51/306 (2013.01); B29C 65/745 (2013.01); B29C 66/8244 (2013.01); B29C 66/8246 (2013.01); B65B 9/2056 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2009023894 A1 20090226; BR PI0813403 A2 20141230; EP 2181042 A1 20100505; EP 2181042 A4 20130911; JP 2010536607 A 20101202; US 2010199614 A1 20100812; US 2013337988 A1 20131219

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150130

2014-10-15 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20140919

2014-10-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B29C 65/02 20060101ALI20140829BHEP

2014-10-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65B 5/02 20060101ALI20140829BHEP

2014-10-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65B 9/20 20120101ALI20140829BHEP

2014-10-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65B 9/12 20060101AFI20140829BHEP

2014-10-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B29C 65/74 20060101ALI20140829BHEP

2014-10-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65B 1/02 20060101ALI20140829BHEP

2014-10-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65B 51/30 20060101ALI20140829BHEP

2014-10-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B29C 65/00 20060101ALI20140829BHEP

2014-10-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65B 51/14 20060101ALI20140829BHEP

2014-04-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20140401

2013-09-11 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20130813

2013-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B29C 65/02 20060101ALI20130807BHEP

2013-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65B 1/02 20060101ALI20130807BHEP

2013-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65B 51/30 20060101ALI20130807BHEP

2013-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65B 9/20 20120101ALI20130807BHEP

2013-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65B 51/14 20060101ALI20130807BHEP

2013-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65B 9/12 20060101AFI20130807BHEP

2013-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65B 5/02 20060101ALI20130807BHEP

2013-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B29C 65/00 20060101ALI20130807BHEP

2010-12-01 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2010-05-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-05-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-05-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS