Global Patent Index - EP 2186534 B8

EP 2186534 B8 2013-09-25 - Liquid filtering method

Title (en)

Liquid filtering method

Title (de)

Flüssigkeitsfilterungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Procédé de filtrage de liquide

Publication

EP 2186534 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 10154825 A

Priority

  • EP 02708773 A
  • JP 2001116216 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2004149657A1] A filtering method and system which prevents adhesion between an outlet vessel and a filter element and which uses a flexible filter which allows smooth flow of liquid and is superior in filtering performance. The method uses a flexible vessel having an inlet and an outlet for liquid, a sheet-like filter element, and a filter in which the inlet and outlet for liquid are separated by the filter element, wherein in filtering a liquid by the action of gravity or of a liquid feed pump, the pressure in the outlet of the filter is not less than 0 mmHg with respect to the atmospheric pressure; and a filtering system.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 1/36 (2006.01); A61M 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61M 1/3636 (2013.01); A61M 1/0222 (2013.01); A61M 1/0231 (2013.01); A61M 1/3633 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

US 2004149657 A1 20040805; US 7438821 B2 20081021; AT 480272 T 20100915; AU 2002243033 B2 20060202; CN 1247292 C 20060329; CN 1501820 A 20040602; DE 60237649 D1 20101021; EP 1586339 A2 20051019; EP 1586339 A4 20080820; EP 1586339 B1 20100908; EP 2186534 A2 20100519; EP 2186534 A3 20101006; EP 2186534 B1 20121128; EP 2186534 B8 20130925; JP 4531334 B2 20100825; JP WO2002083200 A1 20041014; KR 100846015 B1 20080711; KR 20030094341 A 20031211; WO 02083200 A2 20021024; WO 02083200 A3 20050901

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-03-21 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20171221

2017-12-21 [REG DE R100] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT UNAMENDED NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 60244140

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170502

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-09-16 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: FRESENIUS KABI DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Effective date: 20150721

2015-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2015-07-22 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: FRESENIUS KABI DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Effective date: 20130822

2015-06-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121128

2014-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-29 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2013-11-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121128

2013-11-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121128

2013-11-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-11-28 [REG DE R026] OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT

- Document: DE 60244140

- Effective date: 20130822

2013-10-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: FRESENIUS KABI DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Effective date: 20130822

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121128

2013-08-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121128

2013-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121128

2013-06-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121128

2013-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130328

2013-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121128

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121128

2013-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121128

2013-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130311

2013-04-17 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20121128

2013-04-15 [REG AT MK05] REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT

- Document: AT 585808 T

- Effective date: 20121128

2013-01-24 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60244140

- Effective date: 20130124

2013-01-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2012-12-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ASAHI KASEI MEDICAL CO., LTD.

2012-12-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 585808 T

- Effective date: 20121215

2012-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2012-11-28 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1586339 P

2012-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2012-11-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2012-06-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: UCHI, YUKIHIKO

2012-06-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YOKOMIZO, TOMOHISA

2011-04-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20110311

2010-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2010-05-19 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1586339 P

2010-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR