Global Patent Index - EP 2186819 A1

EP 2186819 A1 2010-05-19 - Novel glucopyranose esters and glucofuranose esters of alkyl- fumarates and their pharmaceutical use

Title (en)

Novel glucopyranose esters and glucofuranose esters of alkyl- fumarates and their pharmaceutical use

Title (de)

Neuartige Glucopyranoseester und Glucofuranoseester von Alkylfumaraten und ihre pharmazeutische Verwendung

Title (fr)

Nouveaux esters de glucopyranose et esters de glucofuranose d'alkyl-fumarates et leur utilisation pharmaceutique

Publication

EP 2186819 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 10151082 A

Priority

  • EP 06753340 A
  • DK PA200501002 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to novel glucofuranose esters and glucopyranose esters of alkyl-fumarates. The esters are suitable for use as active substances in the treatment of e.g. psoriasis or other hyperproliferative, inflammatory or autoimmune disorders.

IPC 8 full level

C07H 13/04 (2006.01); A61K 31/341 (2006.01); A61K 31/351 (2006.01); A61K 31/7024 (2006.01); A61K 31/7028 (2006.01); C07D 309/06 (2006.01)

CPC

C07H 13/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

  • US 6277882 B1 20010821 - JOSHI RAJENDRA K [CH], et al
  • US 6355676 B1 20020312 - JOSHI RAJENDRA KUMAR [CH], et al
  • US 6509376 B1 20030121 - JOSHI RAJENDRA KUMAR [CH], et al
  • US 5424332 A 19950613 - SPEISER PETER P [CH], et al
  • US 6359003 B1 20020319 - JOSHI RAJENDRA KUMAR [CH], et al
  • US 4959389 A 19900925 - SPEISER PETER P [CH], et al
  • US 2004038889 A1 20040226 - JOSHI RAJENDRA KUMAR [CH], et al
  • WO 8901830 A1 19890309 - LE T I TSELLJULOZN [SU], et al
  • DK 2005000648 W 20051007
  • WO 03004001 A1 20030116 - PHAROTECH AS [DK], et al
  • WO 03080034 A2 20031002 - PHARMATECH GMBH [DE], et al
  • US 6537584 B1 20030325 - ZENTNER GAYLEN M [US], et al
  • US 5484610 A 19960116 - BAE YOU H [US]
  • LITJENS ET AL., BR. J. CLIN. PHARMACOL., vol. 58, no. 4, 2004, pages 429 - 432
  • REDDINGIUS W.G.: "Bioanalysis and Pharmacokinetics of Fumarates in Humans", DISSERTATION ETH ZURICH NO. 12199, 1997
  • "Treatment of disseminated granuloma annulare with fumaric acid esters", BMC DERMATOLOGY, vol. 2, no. 5, 2002
  • ALTMEYER ET AL., J. AM. ACAD. DERMATOL., 1994
  • ALTMEYER PJ ET AL.: "Antipsoriatic effect of fumaric acid derivatives. Results of a multicenter double-blind study in 100 patients", J. AM. ACAD. DERMATOL., vol. 30, 1994, pages 977 - 81
  • "Rook/Wilkinson/Ebling textbook of dermatology", vol. 3, 1998, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC, pages: 2099 - 2104
  • O'TOOLE ET AL., CANCER, vol. 88, no. 4, 2000, pages 770 - 776
  • WERDENBERG ET AL., BIOPHARM. DRUG DISPOS., vol. 24, pages 259 - 273
  • K.S. RAO; S.H. MISHRA, J. ETHNOPHARMACOLOGY, vol. 60, no. 3, pages 207 - 213
  • SPATZ; STONE, J. ORG. CHEM., vol. 23, no. 10, 1958, pages 1559 - 1560
  • A. JAKAS; V. MAGNUS; S. HORVAT; G. SANDBERG, J. LABELL. COMP. PHARM., vol. 33, no. 10, 1993, pages 933 - 939
  • K. LOHITH; S. DIVAKAR, J. BIOTECHNOL., vol. 117, 2005, pages 49 - 56
  • NAJARIAN DJ; GOTTLIEB AB: "Connections between psoriasis and Crohn's disease", J AM ACAD DERMATOL., vol. 48, no. 6, June 2003 (2003-06-01), pages 805 - 21
  • OJETTI V ET AL.: "High prevalence of celiac disease in psoriasis", AM J GASTROENTEROL., vol. 98, no. 11, November 2003 (2003-11-01), pages 2574 - 5
  • GUPTA MA; GUPTA AK: "Psychiatric and psychological co-morbidity in patients with dermatologic disorders: epidemiology and management", AM J CLIN DERMATOL., vol. 4, no. 12, 2003, pages 833 - 42
  • MALLBRIS L: "Psoriasis phenotype at disease onset: clinical characterization of 400 adult cases", J INVEST DERMATOL., vol. 124, no. 3, March 2005 (2005-03-01), pages 499 - 504

Citation (search report)

  • [A] DE 2530372 A1 19770113 - SCHWECKENDIEK WALTER DR
  • [A] US 6509376 B1 20030121 - JOSHI RAJENDRA KUMAR [CH], et al
  • [A] US 6277882 B1 20010821 - JOSHI RAJENDRA K [CH], et al
  • [A] TETRAHEDRON LETTERS , 25(18), 1941-4 CODEN: TELEAY; ISSN: 0040-4039, 1984, XP002101927 & DATABASE CA [online] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US; 16 November 1984 (1984-11-16), KAWAI, HIROYUKI ET AL: "Studies on arugomycin, a new anthracycline antibiotic. Part II. Structural elucidation of arugomycin", XP002396501, retrieved from STN Database accession no. 101:152215

DCS

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

DOCDB simple family

WO 2007006308 A1 20070118; AT 455783 T 20100215; DE 602006011910 D1 20100311; EP 1915387 A1 20080430; EP 1915387 B1 20100120; EP 2186819 A1 20100519; US 2010144651 A1 20100610