EP 2193453 A4 20120801 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR INTUITIVE MODELING OF COMPLEX NETWORKS IN A DIGITAL ENVIRONMENT
Title (en)
SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR INTUITIVE MODELING OF COMPLEX NETWORKS IN A DIGITAL ENVIRONMENT
Title (de)
SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANSCHAULICHEN GESTALTUNG KOMPLEXER NETZWERKE IN EINER DIGITALEN UMGEBUNG
Title (fr)
SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE MODÉLISATION INTUITIVE DE RÉSEAUX COMPLEXES DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT NUMÉRIQUE
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 2008077684 W 20080925
- US 97506307 P 20070925
- US 23603008 A 20080923
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2009042772A1] A system for modeling a topology of an electrical power system is disclosed. The system can include a processor, a memory, a display device, and an input device.
IPC 8 full level
G05B 17/02 (2006.01); G06F 17/00 (2006.01); G06F 17/50 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
G05B 17/02 (2013.01); G06F 30/18 (2020.01); G06F 2111/02 (2020.01); G06F 2111/12 (2020.01); G06F 2119/06 (2020.01)
Citation (search report)
- [X] US 6530065 B1 20030304 - MCDONALD DUNCAN R [US], et al
- [X] AZBC V ET AL: "Computer-aided coordination of power system protection", COMPUTER AS A TOOL : THE IEEE REGION 8 EUROCON 2003 ; 22 - 24 SEPTEMBER 2003, FACULTY OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERING, UNIVERSITY OF LJUBLJANA, LJUBLJANA, SLOVENIA ; PROCEEDINGS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, vol. 2, 22 September 2003 (2003-09-22), pages 268 - 272, XP010671508, ISBN: 978-0-7803-7763-9, DOI: 10.1109/EURCON.2003.1248197
- [X] QIU B ET AL: "Web-Based SCADA Display Systems (WSDS) forAccess via Internet", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON POWER SYSTEMS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, vol. 15, no. 2, 1 May 2000 (2000-05-01), XP011050984, ISSN: 0885-8950
- See references of WO 2009042772A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2009042772 A1 20090402; AU 2008304386 A1 20090402; CA 2698612 A1 20090402; EP 2193453 A1 20100609; EP 2193453 A4 20120801
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 2008077684 W 20080925; AU 2008304386 A 20080925; CA 2698612 A 20080925; EP 08832975 A 20080925