EP 2227992 A1 20100915 - Body designed in the style of a textile cover or pacifier
Title (en)
Body designed in the style of a textile cover or pacifier
Title (de)
Nach Art eines textilen Bedeckungs- bzw. Ruhemittels ausgebildeter Körper
Title (fr)
Corps formé à la manière d'un moyen de recouvrement ou d'appui textile
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 09014109 A 20091111
Abstract (en)
The body (10) has metal wool materials (16) i.e. steel wool materials, arranged in metal wool layers (17) above each other in an inner space (15) formed between a front side (11) and a rear side (12) of the body. The front and rear sides are provided with respective grid type areas. The front and rear sides and a textile cover are made of an organic textile layer (18) e.g. cotton wool. The front and rear sides are detachably connected with a separable closure (20) i.e. slide fastener. The textile cover is provided with the closure.
Abstract (de)
Es wird ein nach Art eines textilen Bedeckungs- bzw. Ruhemittels ausgebildeter Körper (10) vorgeschlagen, der wenigstens eine Vorderseite (11) und eine Rückseite (12) aufweist. In einem zwischen der Vorderseite (11) und der Rückseite (12) gebildeten Innenraum (15) ist Metallwolle (16) angeordnet.
IPC 8 full level
CPC (source: EP)
A47G 9/007 (2013.01); A47G 2200/106 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [XY] DE 20019623 U1 20010308 - ROSINSKI BEATE [DE]
- [X] US 5806154 A 19980915 - TOLBERT THOMAS WARREN [US]
- [X] JP 2004350990 A 20041216 - GELTEC CO LTD
- [X] DE 20204275 U1 20020704 - KRANZ CHRISTINE [DE]
- [Y] FR 2506611 A1 19821203 - MASSON ALAIN [FR]
Citation (examination)
- ORGONICS ORGONE ACCUMULATORS ET AL: "Orgone Energy Blankets", INTERNET CITATION, 1 March 2009 (2009-03-01), pages 1 - 7, XP007919515
- GELESEN 3653: "Alternativ-Material- was funktioniert???", INTERNET CITATION, 19 April 2008 (2008-04-19), pages 1 - 7, XP007919514
- JAMERLING OGG: "HOW TO BUILD AN ORGONE BLANKET OR PILLOW", INTERNET CITATION, 14 April 2009 (2009-04-14), pages 1 - 2, XP007919513
- ORGONE ACCUMULATOR PUBLIC FORUM: "ORGONE ACCUMULATOR PUBLIC FORUM 2000", INTERNET CITATION, 22 February 1996 (1996-02-22), pages 1 - 12, XP007919512
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
AL BA RS
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 09014109 A 20091111