EP 2229827 B1 20161130 - CIGARETTE FILTER, AND FILTER CIGARETTE
Title (en)
CIGARETTE FILTER, AND FILTER CIGARETTE
Title (de)
ZIGARETTENFILTER UND FILTERZIGARETTE
Title (fr)
FILTRE DE CIGARETTE ET CIGARETTE À FILTRE
Publication
Application
Priority
- JP 2008072074 W 20081204
- JP 2007323802 A 20071214
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP2229827A1] A single-segment filter having a filter plug uses a high-rigidity and high-permeability paper longitudinal rigidity of which is 30 or higher as measured in accordance with JIS P8143 and air permeability of which is 1000 CORESTA units or greater as a filter plug wrapper wrapping a filter material, and a multisegment filter having a plurality of filter plugs uses the high-rigidity and high-permeability paper as a filter plug wrapper wrapping a filter material and/or a shaping paper joining plurality of filter plugs. A cigarette comprises the particular filter.
IPC 8 full level
A24D 1/02 (2006.01); A24D 3/02 (2006.01); A24D 3/16 (2006.01); D21H 27/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
A24D 1/02 (2013.01 - EP US); A24D 1/04 (2013.01 - EP US); A24D 3/14 (2013.01 - EP US); A24D 3/163 (2013.01 - EP US); D21H 27/16 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (opposition)
Opponent : Bungartz Christophersen Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte
- WO 0203819 A1 20020117 - PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH], et al
- GB 1372692 A 19741106 - MOLINS LTD
- GB 2135168 A 19840830 - TABAC FAB REUNIES SA
- US 4574821 A 19860311 - FISCHER EUGENE B [US], et al
- US 4553556 A 19851119 - LEPHARDT JOHN O [US]
- EP 0671131 A1 19950913 - ROTHMANS INTERNATIONAL LTD [GB]
- KR 20060031173 A 20060412 - KT & G CORP
- US 5107866 A 19920428 - ARONOFF ARTHUR [US], et al
- "Porowrap ® - Porous Plug Wrap Papers Catalogue", PAPETERIES DE MAUDUIT, 24 February 1993 (1993-02-24), XP055416919
- "PPW 115 STIFF", INDUSTRY DOCUMENTS LIBRARY, pages 24
- "PPW 115 STIFF", INDUSTRY DOCUMENTS LIBRARY
- "Porowrap - Papier de Gainage Poreux", PAPETERIES DE MAUDUIT, 1 January 1988 (1988-01-01), XP055416924
- "Paper - Determination of stiffness by Clark stiffness tester", JAPANESE INDUSTRIAL STANDARD JIS P 8143-1996, 14 March 1996 (1996-03-14), XP055416929
- "PPW 60 STIFF data sheet", PDM INDUSTRIES, 26 February 2015 (2015-02-26), XP055416935
- "Annual Report", SCHWEITZER-MAUDUIT INTERNATIONAL, INC., 31 December 2007 (2007-12-31), XP055416938
- "World Tobacco Dictionary", 1983, article "World Tobacco Dictionary", pages: 330, XP055416944
- E. VOGES: "Tobacco Encyclopedia", 1984, article "Kimberly-Clark Has The Broadest Line of Products For The Tobacco Industry", pages: 185, XP055416949
- E. VOGES: "Tobacco Encyclopedia", 2000, ISBN: 3920615468, pages: 188, XP055416952
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 2229827 A1 20100922; EP 2229827 A4 20120523; EP 2229827 B1 20161130; CA 2708837 A1 20090625; CA 2708837 C 20130205; CN 101896082 A 20101124; CN 101896082 B 20131002; ES 2608059 T3 20170405; HK 1145611 A1 20110429; JP 5043127 B2 20121010; JP WO2009078287 A1 20110428; KR 101225823 B1 20130123; KR 20100076062 A 20100705; MY 150067 A 20131129; RU 2423571 C1 20110710; TW 200930312 A 20090716; TW I404509 B 20130811; UA 95201 C2 20110711; US 2010242977 A1 20100930; WO 2009078287 A1 20090625
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 08861079 A 20081204; CA 2708837 A 20081204; CN 200880120786 A 20081204; ES 08861079 T 20081204; HK 10111981 A 20101222; JP 2008072074 W 20081204; JP 2009546216 A 20081204; KR 20107012532 A 20081204; MY PI20102751 A 20081204; RU 2010129049 A 20081204; TW 97147970 A 20081210; UA A201008763 A 20081204; US 81394710 A 20100611