Global Patent Index - EP 2236245 A3

EP 2236245 A3 2013-09-11 - Equipment and method for cleaning polishing cloth

Title (en)

Equipment and method for cleaning polishing cloth

Title (de)

Ausrüstung und Verfahren zum Reinigen eines Polierlappens

Title (fr)

Équipement et procédé pour le nettoyage d'un tissu de polissage

Publication

EP 2236245 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 10250452 A

Priority

JP 2009079630 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2236245A2] The equipment (34) for cleaning polishing cloth (16) is capable of increasing pressure of washing water received by the polishing cloth (16), securely removing deposits from the polishing cloth (16) and improving polishing efficiency. The equipment (34) is used in a polishing apparatus (10), in which a work piece (20) is pressed onto the polishing cloth (16) adhered on a polishing plate (12) and the work piece (20) is relatively moved with respect to the polishing plate (12) with supplying slurry to the polishing cloth (16) so as to polish the work piece (20). The equipment (34) comprises a nozzle unit (48) having a nozzle (50) capable of spraying high-pressure washing water toward the polishing cloth (16). The nozzle (50) is a straight nozzle capable of linearly spraying the washing water and perpendicularly spraying the washing water with respect to the polishing cloth (16).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 37/04 (2012.01); B24B 53/007 (2006.01); H01L 21/304 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 53/017 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA ME RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2236245 A2 20101006; EP 2236245 A3 20130911; CN 101844328 A 20100929; JP 2010228058 A 20101014; KR 20100108254 A 20101006; TW 201103697 A 20110201; US 2010248597 A1 20100930

INPADOC legal status


2015-06-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150113

2014-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20140901

2014-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20140307

2014-04-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR

2013-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR

2013-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA ME RS

2013-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B24B 37/04 20120101AFI20130802BHEP

2013-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B24B 53/007 20060101ALI20130802BHEP

2010-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR

2010-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA ME RS