Global Patent Index - EP 2248793 B8

EP 2248793 B8 2013-09-25 - Production method for a monohydric alcohol from a monocarboxylic acid or from a derivative thereof

Title (en)

Production method for a monohydric alcohol from a monocarboxylic acid or from a derivative thereof

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines monohydrischen Alkohols aus einer Monocarboxylsäure oder einem Derivat davon

Title (fr)

Procédé de production d'alcool monohydrique à partir d'alcool monocarboxylique ou d'un dérivé correspondant

Publication

EP 2248793 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 09718149 A

Priority

  • KR 2009000963 W
  • KR 20080021115 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US7847134B2] Disclosed herein is a method for producing monohydric alcohols from monocarboxylic acids or derivatives thereof using a catalyst comprising ruthenium (Ru) and tin (Sn) using zinc oxide (ZnO) as both a catalyst support and an active promoter; a catalyst prepared by adding an inorganic binder such as silica, alumina or titania in a limited range to the catalyst comprising the above components in order to impart a shaping ability to the catalyst; or, a modified catalyst reformed by adding at least one reducing component selected from the group consisting of Co, Ni, Cu, Ag, Rh, Pd, Re, Ir, and Pt to the catalyst in order to improve the reducing ability of the catalyst. By using such catalysts, the method according to the present invention is advantageous in that the monohydric alcohols can be prepared in high yield regardless of whether the monocarboxylic acids contain water or not, the monohydric alcohols can be economically prepared because the catalysts can be operated under mild reaction conditions and also exhibits high selectivity and productivity compared to conventional catalysts, and the catalysts have excellent long-term reaction stability so as to be advantageous for industrial applications.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07C 29/149 (2006.01); B01J 23/62 (2006.01); B01J 23/656 (2006.01); B01J 23/89 (2006.01); B01J 37/03 (2006.01); B01J 37/10 (2006.01); C07C 29/147 (2006.01); C07C 31/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07C 29/149 (2013.01); B01J 23/626 (2013.01); B01J 23/6567 (2013.01); B01J 23/8966 (2013.01); B01J 37/031 (2013.01); B01J 37/10 (2013.01); B01J 37/0009 (2013.01); B01J 37/18 (2013.01); B01J 2523/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C07C 29/149 + C07C 31/12
  2. B01J 2523/00 + B01J 2523/27 + B01J 2523/43 + B01J 2523/821
  3. B01J 2523/00 + B01J 2523/27 + B01J 2523/43 + B01J 2523/74 + B01J 2523/821 + B01J 2523/828
  4. B01J 2523/00 + B01J 2523/27 + B01J 2523/43 + B01J 2523/821 + B01J 2523/845
  5. B01J 2523/00 + B01J 2523/17 + B01J 2523/27 + B01J 2523/43 + B01J 2523/821
  6. B01J 2523/00 + B01J 2523/27 + B01J 2523/43 + B01J 2523/47 + B01J 2523/821
  7. B01J 2523/00 + B01J 2523/27 + B01J 2523/41 + B01J 2523/43 + B01J 2523/821

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA RS

EPO simple patent family

US 2010113843 A1 20100506; US 7847134 B2 20101207; EP 2248793 A2 20101110; EP 2248793 A4 20120711; EP 2248793 B1 20130814; EP 2248793 B8 20130925; JP 2009215289 A 20090924; JP 5275080 B2 20130828; KR 100922998 B1 20091022; KR 20090095892 A 20090910; WO 2009110698 A2 20090911; WO 2009110698 A3 20091119

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 9

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161223

- Year of fee payment: 9

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 9

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 9

2016-12-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2016-07-29 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT; INVALID AB INITIO

- Effective date: 20090227

2016-07-29 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130814

2016-05-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130814

2016-02-29 [PG25 MT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130814

2016-01-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 8

2015-01-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140227

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140227

2015-01-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 7

2014-12-03 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2014-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140227

2014-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130814

2014-09-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140227

2014-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-08-28 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602009017971

- Effective date: 20140515

2014-07-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20140515

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130814

2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130814

2014-04-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130814

2014-04-30 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130814

2014-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130814

2014-04-30 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130814

2014-04-30 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130814

2014-03-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130814

2014-02-28 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130814

2014-02-28 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130814

2014-02-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130814

2014-02-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20131115

2014-02-28 [PG25 PL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130814

2014-01-31 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20131214

2014-01-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130911

2014-01-31 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130814

2014-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130814

2014-01-31 [PG25 NO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20131114

2014-01-31 [PG25 HR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130814

2014-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20131216

2014-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130814

2014-01-27 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2014-01-15 [REG AT MK05] REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT

- Document: AT 626729 T

- Effective date: 20130814

2013-12-11 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2013-10-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KOREA RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF CHEMICAL TECHNOLOG, KR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KOREA RESERACH INSTITUTE OF CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGY, TAEJEON-SI, KR

- Document: DE 602009017971

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-10-10 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602009017971

- Effective date: 20131010

2013-09-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2013-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2013-08-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 626729 T

- Effective date: 20130815

2013-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-08-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA RS

2013-08-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2012-07-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20120612

2012-07-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B01J 23/89 20060101ALI20120605BHEP

2012-07-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B01J 23/62 20060101ALI20120605BHEP

2012-07-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07C 29/147 20060101ALI20120605BHEP

2012-07-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B01J 23/656 20060101ALI20120605BHEP

2012-07-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07C 29/149 20060101AFI20120605BHEP

2012-07-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B01J 37/03 20060101ALI20120605BHEP

2012-07-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B01J 37/10 20060101ALI20120605BHEP

2012-07-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07C 31/12 20060101ALI20120605BHEP

2012-06-05 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 602009017971

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: C07C0029147000

- IPC: C07C0029149000

2010-11-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090925

2010-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-11-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA RS