EP 2268396 A2 20110105 - CATALYST FOR REACTING CARBOXYLIC ACID NITRILES
Title (en)
CATALYST FOR REACTING CARBOXYLIC ACID NITRILES
Title (de)
KATALYSATOR ZUR UMSETZUNG VON CARBONSÄURENITRILEN
Title (fr)
CATALYSEUR DE TRANSFORMATION DE NITRILES D'ACIDE CARBOXYLIQUE
Publication
Application
Priority
- EP 2009052239 W 20090226
- DE 102008001319 A 20080422
Abstract (en)
[origin: CA2722334A1] The invention relates to a catalyst for reacting carboxylic acid nitriles with water, the catalyst comprising at least 60% by weight of manganese dioxide having the empirical formula MnOx, wherein x is in the range of 1.7 to 2.0, and at least one plasticizer. The invention further relates to a method for producing the catalysts mentioned above and to a method for producing carboxylic acid amides by reacting carboxylic acid nitriles with water in the presence of the catalyst according to the invention.
IPC 8 full level
B01J 23/34 (2006.01); B01J 37/00 (2006.01); C07C 231/06 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
B01J 23/34 (2013.01 - EP US); B01J 37/0009 (2013.01 - EP US); B01J 37/0063 (2013.01 - EP US); C07C 231/065 (2013.01 - EP US); B01J 35/30 (2024.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
See references of WO 2009130075A2
Citation (examination)
- JP H09104665 A 19970422 - DAICEL CHEM & DAICEL CHEM: "Patent Abstracts of Japan of JP H09 104665 A", 22 April 1997 (1997-04-22), XP055136682 & DAICEL CHEM: "JPO: MACHINE TRANSLATION OF JP H09 104665 A", 22 April 1997 (1997-04-22), XP055136829 & DAICEL CHEM: "CORRECTED MACHINE TRANSLATION OF JP H09 104665 A", 22 April 1997 (1997-04-22), XP055136692
- US 5653949 A 19970805 - CHEN JAMES M [US], et al
- US 4290923 A 19810922 - MEIN PETER G, et al
- EP 0945429 A1 19990929 - MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]
- EP 0379111 A2 19900725 - MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]
- FERDI SCHÜTH ET AL: "Handbook of Heterogeneous Catalysis 2nd ed.", 29 February 2008 (2008-02-29), pages 676 - 699, XP055136695
- "Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry 5th Edition Volume A7", 25 December 1086, VCH, Weinheim; New York, NY, article "Structure and Composition of Clay Minerals", pages: 110 - 113, XP055136697
Citation (third parties)
Third party :
- EP 0956898 A2 19991117 - MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]
- JP H09104665 A 19970422 - DAICEL CHEM
- US 5653949 A 19970805 - CHEN JAMES M [US], et al
- US 4290923 A 19810922 - MEIN PETER G, et al
- EP 0945429 A1 19990929 - MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]
- EP 0379111 A2 19900725 - MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]
- ERTL G. ET AL: "Handbook of Heterogeneous Catalysis, Second, Completely Revised and Enlarged Edition", vol. 1, February 2008, pages: 676 - 699, XP003028625
- GERHARTZ W. ET AL: "Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, Fifth, Completely Revised Edition", vol. A7, 1986, pages: 110 - 113, XP003028626
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
AL BA RS
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DE 102008001319 A1 20091029; BR PI0910762 A2 20170829; CA 2722334 A1 20091029; CN 102015099 A 20110413; CN 105148905 A 20151216; EG 26411 A 20131022; EP 2268396 A2 20110105; HK 1213217 A1 20160630; JP 2011518039 A 20110623; JP 5377628 B2 20131225; KR 101551994 B1 20150909; KR 20110008049 A 20110125; MX 2010011667 A 20110218; MY 158755 A 20161115; RU 2010147293 A 20120527; RU 2496575 C2 20131027; RU 2496575 C9 20140820; TW 201004699 A 20100201; TW I460013 B 20141111; US 2011034728 A1 20110210; US 9289752 B2 20160322; WO 2009130075 A2 20091029; WO 2009130075 A3 20100114
DOCDB simple family (application)
DE 102008001319 A 20080422; BR PI0910762 A 20090226; CA 2722334 A 20090226; CN 200980114165 A 20090226; CN 201510544491 A 20090226; EG 2010101752 A 20101019; EP 09734323 A 20090226; EP 2009052239 W 20090226; HK 16101186 A 20160202; JP 2011505440 A 20090226; KR 20107023500 A 20090226; MX 2010011667 A 20090226; MY PI2010004573 A 20090226; RU 2010147293 A 20090226; TW 98112838 A 20090417; US 93765909 A 20090226