Global Patent Index - EP 2283651 A4

EP 2283651 A4 2014-09-17 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING DIGITAL MULTIMEDIA BROADCAST SIGNALS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING DIGITAL MULTIMEDIA BROADCAST SIGNALS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN DIGITALER MULTIMEDIA-RUNDFUNKSIGNALE

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'ÉMISSION ET DE RÉCEPTION DE SIGNAUX DE DIFFUSION MULTIMÉDIA NUMÉRIQUE

Publication

EP 2283651 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 08874406 A

Priority

  • KR 2008006972 W
  • KR 20080047913 A
  • KR 20080067448 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2009142373A1] The present invention relates to a multimedia broadcast signal transmitting/receiving method, and it generates a pilot signal by mapping transmission information on an orthogonal code, disperses the pilot signal in the frequency domain, modulates the dispersed pilot signal, and transmits the modulated pilot signal.

IPC 8 full level

H04N 7/015 (2006.01); H04H 20/95 (2008.01); H04L 5/00 (2006.01); H04L 23/02 (2006.01); H04L 25/02 (2006.01); H04N 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC

H04L 23/02 (2013.01); H04L 5/0016 (2013.01); H04L 5/0048 (2013.01); H04L 25/0226 (2013.01); H04H 20/95 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [I] US 2005226141 A1 20051013 - RO JUNG-MIN [KR], et al
  • [A] US 2007041348 A1 20070222 - KWUN JONG-HYUNG [KR], et al
  • [A] WO 03034645 A1 20030424 - QUALCOMM INC [US]
  • [I] MOTOROLA: "Performance of RS Embedded ACK/NACK", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-080083, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, vol. RAN WG1, no. Sevilla, Spain; 20080108, 8 January 2008 (2008-01-08), XP050108621
  • [I] QUALCOMM EUROPE: "Support of DTX signalling for CQI transmission with normal CP", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-081962, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, vol. RAN WG1, no. Kansas City, USA; 20080514, 14 May 2008 (2008-05-14), XP050110312
  • See also references of WO 2009142373A1

DCS

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

DOCDB simple family

WO 2009142373 A1 20091126; EP 2283651 A1 20110216; EP 2283651 A4 20140917; KR 100964382 B1 20100617; KR 20090122096 A 20091126