EP 2283935 A1 20110216 - Ultrasound converter system and method for its operation
Title (en)
Ultrasound converter system and method for its operation
Title (de)
Ultraschallwandlersystem und Verfahren zu dessen Betrieb
Title (fr)
Système de convertisseur à ultrasons et son procédé de fonctionnement
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 09010474 A 20090813
Abstract (en)
The system has a set of electrodes (2) arranged discrete to each other on a surface of an electrically non-conductive or semi-conductive substrate (1). Each electrode is formed as a metallic thin layer. The electrode with a feedthrough (4) is led into a substrate rear side and connected to an electrical voltage source at the rear side via an electrical contact surface. An active layer (3) made of piezoelectric material is applied on a surface of the electrodes. The active layer is connected to an electrode (8) and to a pole or mass potential of the source in an electrically conductive manner. An independent claim is also included for a method for emitting ultrasonic waves with an ultrasonic transducer system.
Abstract (de)
Die Erfindung betrifft ein Ultraschallwandlersystem und Verfahren zu dessen Betrieb. Dabei können insbesondere Ultraschallwellen mit sehr hohen Frequenzen emittiert und beispielsweise für die zerstörungsfreie Prüfung von Werkstücken oder Bauteilen genutzt werden. Bei einem erfindungsgemäßen System sind an einer Oberfläche eines elektrisch nicht leitfähigen oder halbleitenden Substrats (1) diskret zueinander angeordnete Elektroden (2), die als metallische Dünnschicht ausgebildet und jeweils einzeln mit Durchkontaktierungen (4,5) zur Substratrückseite hindurch geführt sind, vorhanden. An der Substratrückseite sind die Elektroden über eine Kontaktfläche (9,10) mit einer elektrischen Spannungsquelle verbunden. Auf der Oberfläche der Elektroden ist mindestens eine aus einem piezoelektrischen Material gebildete aktive Schicht (3) ausgebildet, die mit mindestens einer weiteren Elektrode (8) und damit mit dem anderen Pol der Spannungsquelle oder dem Massepotential der Spannungsquelle elektrisch leitend verbunden ist.
IPC 8 full level
B06B 1/06 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
B06B 1/0622 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [X] WO 03000337 A2 20030103 - BAE SYSTEMS INFORMATION [US], et al
- [X] US 2003028108 A1 20030206 - MILLER DAVID G [US]
- [X] US 2003102777 A1 20030605 - KUNIYASU TOSHIAKI [JP], et al
- [X] US 2003013969 A1 20030116 - ERIKSON KENNETH R [US], et al
- [X] US 2003205947 A1 20031106 - KLEE MAREIKE KATHARINE [DE], et al
- [Y] WO 9625244 A1 19960822 - PRECISION ACOUSTICS LTD [GB], et al
- [XI] JP 2006122105 A 20060518 - TOSHIBA CORP, et al
- [Y] YUAN YI-QUAN ET AL: "PVDF-DMOS SENSORS AND ARRAY FOR UNDERWATER ACOUSTIC IMAGING", ACOUSTICAL IMAGING. SENDAI, MAY 31 - JUNE 2, 1988; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ACOUSTICAL IMAGING], vol. VOL. 17, 31 May 1988 (1988-05-31) - 2 June 1988 (1988-06-02), pages 609 - 617, XP000044002
Citation (examination)
JP 2003079621 A 20030318 - TOSHIBA CORP
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
AL BA RS
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 09010474 A 20090813