Global Patent Index - EP 2284447 A3

EP 2284447 A3 2017-10-11 - Muffle for baking oven

Title (en)

Muffle for baking oven

Title (de)

Garofenmuffel

Title (fr)

Moufle pour four de cuisson

Publication

EP 2284447 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 10010278 A

Priority

  • EP 03009823 A
  • DE 10226954 A
  • DE 10226957 A
  • DE 10226958 A
  • DE 10241487 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2284447A2] The muffle has holding devices (26) arranged in a set of planes, and exchangeable cooking goods carrier (30) exchangeably-accommodated in the planes at a rear area pointing toward a rear wall of the muffle. Walls lying opposite to each other and/or covers and/or bases of the muffle are attached to guiding units. The guiding units are movable between a rear position in which the carrier is arranged in a cooking area and a front position in which the carrier is arranged in a changing area. A support (66) is attached to the bases of the muffle, and a lower heating body is arranged on the bases.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/168 (2013.01); F24C 15/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 10241487 A1 20040108; EP 2284447 A2 20110216; EP 2284447 A3 20171011

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2017-10-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F24C 15/16 20060101AFI20170901BHEP

2011-07-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS CORPORATION N.V.

2011-03-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS CORPORATION N.V.

2011-03-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KRANZ, WILLI

2011-03-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: POERNER, HARALD

2011-03-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DAENZER, STEFAN

2011-03-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MEISTER, HORST

2011-03-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HILDNER, DIETMAR

2011-03-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KRAEMER, KURT

2011-03-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: EBERT, BERND

2011-03-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TUREK, RICHARD

2011-03-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MICHEL, HERBERT

2011-03-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WALTHER, CHRISTOPH

2011-02-16 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1376019 P

2011-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR