Global Patent Index - EP 2285254 B1

EP 2285254 B1 2017-10-25 - MULTICHANNEL PROFILED ELEMENT FOR CURTAINS, CURTAIN DEVICE COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE MULTICHANNEL PROFILED ELEMENT FOR CURTAINS, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MULTICHANNEL PROFILED ELEMENT FOR CURTAINS

Title (en)

MULTICHANNEL PROFILED ELEMENT FOR CURTAINS, CURTAIN DEVICE COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE MULTICHANNEL PROFILED ELEMENT FOR CURTAINS, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MULTICHANNEL PROFILED ELEMENT FOR CURTAINS

Title (de)

MEHRKANAL-VORHANGPROFIL, VORHANGEINRICHTUNG MIT WENIGSTENS EINEM MEHRKANAL-VORHANGPROFIL UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES MEHRKANAL-VORHANGPROFILS

Title (fr)

PROFILE A RIDEAU A PLUSIEURS CONDUITS, DISPOSITIF A RIDEAU COMPRENANT AU MOINS UN PROFILE A RIDEAU A PLUSIEURS CONDUITS ET PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE UN PROFILE A RIDEAU A PLUSIEURS CONDUITS

Publication

EP 2285254 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 09735761 A

Priority

  • CH 2009000131 W
  • CH 6512008 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2009129640A1] The invention relates to a multichannel profiled element for curtains, comprising a plurality of downwardly open guiding channels (13) for each receiving at least one carriage (5). It consists of a plurality of profiled elements (11, 12) which each form one of the guiding channels (13), can be moved in the longitudinal direction of the channels (13), and are interconnected in a fixed manner perpendicularly to the longitudinal direction. The multichannel profiled element for curtains is suitable for a curtain device and can comprise a curved section (2a) with a comparatively small bending radius.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47H 1/04 (2006.01); A47H 15/04 (2006.01); A47H 23/04 (2006.01); E06B 9/36 (2006.01); A47H 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47H 1/04 (2013.01); A47H 15/04 (2013.01); A47H 23/04 (2013.01); E06B 9/36 (2013.01); E06B 9/362 (2013.01); A47H 2001/045 (2013.01); A47H 2001/047 (2013.01); A47H 2023/025 (2013.01); A47H 2201/02 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49826 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DE 2651541 A1 19770608 - ESPIGUE RENE

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 202009005958 U1 20090730; AU 2009240760 A1 20091029; CN 102014705 A 20110413; EP 2285254 A1 20110223; EP 2285254 B1 20171025; JP 2011518010 A 20110623; US 2011036521 A1 20110217; WO 2009129640 A1 20091029

INPADOC legal status


2018-10-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20180726

2018-09-28 [PG25 MT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171025

2018-08-31 [PG25 PL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171025

2018-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180420

- Year of fee payment: 10

2018-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180419

- Year of fee payment: 10

2018-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180420

- Year of fee payment: 10

2018-07-31 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171025

2018-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171025

2018-07-31 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171025

2018-07-31 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171025

2018-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171025

2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180420

- Year of fee payment: 10

2018-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180410

- Year of fee payment: 10

2018-07-26 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502009014472

2018-05-31 [PG25 HR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171025

2018-05-31 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171025

2018-05-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180125

2018-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180126

2018-05-31 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180225

2018-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171025

2018-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171025

2018-04-30 [PG25 NO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180125

2018-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171025

2018-04-30 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171025

2018-04-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2018-03-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171025

2018-03-12 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2018-02-28 [REG NL MP] PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)

- Effective date: 20171025

2017-11-30 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502009014472

2017-11-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2017-11-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 939064 T

- Effective date: 20171115

2017-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE, CH

2017-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2017-07-05 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170606

2017-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47H 23/02 20060101ALN20170519BHEP

2017-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47H 1/04 20060101AFI20170519BHEP

2017-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47H 23/04 20060101ALI20170519BHEP

2017-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47H 15/04 20060101ALI20170519BHEP

2017-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E06B 9/36 20060101ALI20170519BHEP

2017-06-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47H 23/04 20060101ALI20170518BHEP

2017-06-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47H 23/02 20060101ALN20170518BHEP

2017-06-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E06B 9/36 20060101ALI20170518BHEP

2017-06-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47H 1/04 20060101AFI20170518BHEP

2017-06-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47H 15/04 20060101ALI20170518BHEP

2017-06-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47H 23/02 20060101ALN20170510BHEP

2017-06-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47H 15/04 20060101ALI20170510BHEP

2017-06-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E06B 9/36 20060101ALI20170510BHEP

2017-06-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47H 1/04 20060101AFI20170510BHEP

2017-06-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47H 23/04 20060101ALI20170510BHEP

2015-08-05 [D18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN (DELETED)

2015-07-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150115

2012-08-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20120712

2011-08-03 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2011-02-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20101009

2011-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA RS