Global Patent Index - EP 2296118 A4

EP 2296118 A4 2013-09-18 - ACCUMULATED USE TIME MEASURING METHOD FOR CARGO HANDLING VEHICLE AND CARGO HANDLING VEHICLE USING THE TIME MEASURING METHOD

Title (en)

ACCUMULATED USE TIME MEASURING METHOD FOR CARGO HANDLING VEHICLE AND CARGO HANDLING VEHICLE USING THE TIME MEASURING METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM MESSEN VON ANGESAMMELTER VERWENDUNGSZEIT FÜR EIN GÜTERUMSCHLAGFAHRZEUG SOWIE DAS ZEITMESSVERFAHREN NUTZENDES GÜTERUMSCHLAGFAHRZEUG

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE TEMPS D'UTILISATION CUMULÉ POUR UN VÉHICULE DE MANIPULATION DE FRET ET VÉHICULE DE MANIPULATION DE FRET UTILISANT LE PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE TEMPS

Publication

EP 2296118 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 09773417 A

Priority

  • JP 2009061802 W
  • JP 2008175097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2010001839A1] The use time till a display unit including an hour meter (a time measuring device) is replaced can be continued even if the time measuring device fails, and false alteration after shipping can be prevented while infallibly resetting the hour meter to zero when the vehicle equipped with the hour meter is shipped from the factory.  The cargo handling vehicle includes a first storage device for accumulatively storing the vehicle use time measured by a first time measuring device provided in a display unit of the vehicle and a second storage device for accumulatively storing the vehicle use time measured by a second time measuring device provided in a control device.  The control device allows the first and second storage devices to communicate the accumulated use times stored therein when the electric power of the vehicle is turned on.  The control device compares the accumulated use times and writes the longer accumulated use time in the storage device storing the shorter one.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 5/02 (2006.01); G07C 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 5/02 (2013.01); G07C 5/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 2010001839A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2010001839 A1 20100107; EP 2296118 A1 20110316; EP 2296118 A4 20130918

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-04 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20180308

2013-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI NICHIYU FORKLIFT CO., LTD.

2013-09-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20130821

2013-09-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G07C 5/02 20060101AFI20130815BHEP

2013-09-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G07C 5/04 20060101ALI20130815BHEP

2011-10-12 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2011-03-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20100525

2011-03-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-03-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA RS