Global Patent Index - EP 2298126 B1

EP 2298126 B1 2017-10-04 - TOOTHBRUSH AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (en)

TOOTHBRUSH AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (de)

ZAHNBÜRSTE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

BROSSE À DENT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 2298126 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 10011068 A

Priority

  • EP 03788924 A
  • DE 10259723 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2004117934A1] The invention relates to a toothbrush which is produced by AFT and has a head part and at least one carrier element connected thereto, in the case of which the front surface of the head part, said front surface being formed by the top surfaces of the at least one carrier element, has a non-planar three-dimensional configuration and/or is capable of assuming such a configuration during intended use. The invention also relates to a process for producing such a toothbrush.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46D 3/04 (2006.01); A46B 3/06 (2006.01); A46B 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 9/04 (2013.01); A46B 3/06 (2013.01); A46B 5/0029 (2013.01); A46B 9/026 (2013.01); A46B 15/0032 (2013.01); A46B 17/08 (2013.01); A46D 3/045 (2013.01); A46B 3/20 (2013.01); A46B 7/06 (2013.01); A46B 15/0002 (2013.01); A46B 2200/1066 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

US 2004117934 A1 20040624; US 6988777 B2 20060124; AU 2003293588 A1 20040714; AU 2003293588 B2 20101209; AU 2011200832 A1 20110317; AU 2011200832 B2 20120223; BR 0317399 A 20051116; CA 2503778 A1 20040708; CA 2503778 C 20120717; CA 2503778 E 20040708; CN 100475088 C 20090408; CN 101332012 A 20081231; CN 101332012 B 20150114; CN 1713838 A 20051228; DE 10259723 A1 20040701; EP 1571945 A1 20050914; EP 2292118 A1 20110309; EP 2292118 B1 20170503; EP 2298126 A1 20110323; EP 2298126 B1 20171004; HK 1082393 A1 20091211; KR 101052370 B1 20110728; KR 20050084431 A 20050826; MX PA05005332 A 20050816; RU 2005122642 A 20060610; RU 2008114903 A 20091027; RU 2334445 C2 20080927; RU 2502454 C2 20131227; US 2006080795 A1 20060420; US 2007094824 A1 20070503; US 2009193604 A1 20090806; US 2011010881 A1 20110120; US 2011258797 A1 20111027; US 2013180069 A1 20130718; US 2014075696 A1 20140320; US 2016088925 A1 20160331; US 7162767 B2 20070116; US 7549187 B2 20090623; US 7774891 B2 20100817; US 7992247 B2 20110809; US 8418306 B2 20130416; US 8613123 B2 20131224; US 9232852 B2 20160112; WO 2004056235 A1 20040708

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180105

2018-05-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180104

2018-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171004

2018-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171004

2018-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171004

2018-03-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171004

2018-02-07 [REG NL MP] PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)

- Effective date: 20171004

2017-11-16 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 50315703

2017-11-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2017-10-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 933205 T

- Effective date: 20171015

2017-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-10-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL AND PARTN, CH

2017-10-04 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1571945 P

2017-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2017-10-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-06-14 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170518

2017-06-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FISCHER, FRANZ

2017-06-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PFENNIGER, PHILIPP

2016-07-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20160628

2011-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20110922

2011-03-23 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1571945 P

2011-03-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR