Global Patent Index - EP 2300004 A4

EP 2300004 A4 2012-05-30 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS RELATING TO HEAT SHOCK TRANSCRIPTION FACTOR ACTIVATING COMPOUNDS AND TARGETS THEREOF

Title (en)

COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS RELATING TO HEAT SHOCK TRANSCRIPTION FACTOR ACTIVATING COMPOUNDS AND TARGETS THEREOF

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT HITZESCHOCK-TRANSKRIPTIONSFAKTOR-AKTIVIERENDEN VERBINDUNGEN UND ZIELE DAFÜR

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS AYANT TRAIT AUX COMPOSÉS ACTIVANT LE FACTEUR DE TRANSCRIPTION DE CHOC THERMIQUE ET CIBLES CORRESPONDANTES

Publication

EP 2300004 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 09747702 A

Priority

  • US 2009044186 W
  • US 5351308 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2009140621A2] The present invention relates to HSF activating compounds, methods for their discovery, and their research and therapeutic uses. In particular, the present invention provides compounds capable of facilitating HSFl activation, and methods of using such compounds as therapeutic agents to treat a number of conditions associated with protein misfolding.

IPC 8 full level

A61K 31/415 (2006.01); A61K 31/4155 (2006.01); A61K 31/426 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); A61P 25/16 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07D 277/38 (2006.01); C07D 277/60 (2006.01)

CPC

A61K 31/4155 (2013.01); A61K 31/415 (2013.01); A61K 31/426 (2013.01); A61K 45/06 (2013.01); C07D 231/40 (2013.01); C07D 277/42 (2013.01); C07D 277/60 (2013.01); C07D 409/04 (2013.01); C07K 14/47 (2013.01)

C-Set

  1. A61K 31/426 + A61K 2300/00
  2. A61K 31/4155 + A61K 2300/00
  3. A61K 31/415 + A61K 2300/00

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] WO 2004110350 A2 20041223 - NEUROGENETICS INC [US], et al
  • [XY] WO 2005026137 A2 20050324 - VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al
  • [XY] WO 2006013054 A1 20060209 - HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al
  • [Y] WO 2005041879 A2 20050512 - PHARMACIA CORP [US], et al
  • [Y] WO 2005044194 A2 20050519 - PHARMACIA CORP [US], et al
  • [A] SALEHI A H ET AL: "AEG3482 Is an Antiapoptotic Compound that Inhibits Jun Kinase Activity and Cell Death through Induced Expression of Heat Shock Protein 70", CHEMISTRY AND BIOLOGY, CURRENT BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, vol. 13, no. 2, 1 February 2006 (2006-02-01), pages 213 - 223, XP025131819, ISSN: 1074-5521, [retrieved on 20060201], DOI: 10.1016/J.CHEMBIOL.2005.11.012
  • [A] TROTT AMY ET AL: "Activation of heat shock and antioxidant responses by the natural product celastrol: Transcriptional signatures of a thiol-targeted molecule", MOLECULAR BIOLOGY OF THE CELL, vol. 19, no. 3, March 2008 (2008-03-01), pages 1104 - 1112, XP002673716, ISSN: 1059-1524
  • [A] BATULAN Z ET AL: "Induction of multiple heat shock proteins and neuroprotection in a primary culture model of familial amyotrophic lateral sclerosis", NEUROBIOLOGY OF DISEASE, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, OXFORD, GB, vol. 24, no. 2, 1 November 2006 (2006-11-01), pages 213 - 225, XP024901478, ISSN: 0969-9961, [retrieved on 20061101], DOI: 10.1016/J.NBD.2006.06.017
  • [A] POWERS ET AL: "Inhibitors of the heat shock response: Biology and pharmacology", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 581, no. 19, 31 July 2007 (2007-07-31), pages 3758 - 3769, XP022191504, ISSN: 0014-5793, DOI: 10.1016/J.FEBSLET.2007.05.040
  • [A] WESTERHEIDE SANDY D ET AL: "Heat shock response modulators as therapeutic tools for diseases of protein conformation", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, INC, US, vol. 280, no. 39, 1 September 2005 (2005-09-01), pages 33097 - 33100, XP002637231, ISSN: 0021-9258, DOI: 10.1074/JBC.R500010200
  • [XY] LEONE S ET AL: "SAR and QSAR study on 2-aminothiazole derivatives, modulators of transcriptional repression in Huntington's disease", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, PERGAMON, GB, vol. 16, no. 10, 30 March 2008 (2008-03-30), pages 5695 - 5703, XP022673151, ISSN: 0968-0896, [retrieved on 20080330], DOI: 10.1016/J.BMC.2008.03.067
  • [Y] GALAM ET AL: "High-throughput assay for the identification of Hsp90 inhibitors based on Hsp90-dependent refolding of firefly luciferase", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, PERGAMON, GB, vol. 15, no. 5, 31 January 2007 (2007-01-31), pages 1939 - 1946, XP005867161, ISSN: 0968-0896, DOI: 10.1016/J.BMC.2007.01.004
  • [T] DANIEL W. NEEF ET AL: "Heat shock transcription factor 1 as a therapeutic target in neurodegenerative diseases", NATURE REVIEWS DRUG DISCOVERY, vol. 10, no. 12, 1 January 2011 (2011-01-01), pages 930 - 944, XP055024215, ISSN: 1474-1776, DOI: 10.1038/nrd3453
  • [T] NEEF DANIEL W ET AL: "Modulation of Heat Shock Transcription Factor 1 as a Therapeutic Target for Small Molecule Intervention in Neurodegenerative Disease", PLOS BIOLOGY, vol. 8, no. 1, January 2010 (2010-01-01), XP002673717

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA RS

DOCDB simple family

WO 2009140621 A2 20091119; WO 2009140621 A3 20100225; WO 2009140621 A8 20110512; CA 2724413 A1 20091119; CA 2724413 C 20161018; CN 102088973 A 20110608; EP 2300004 A2 20110330; EP 2300004 A4 20120530