EP 2307442 A4 20120530 - PURIFICATION OF MODIFIED CYTOKINES
Title (en)
PURIFICATION OF MODIFIED CYTOKINES
Title (de)
AUFREINIGUNG MODIFIZIERTER CYTOKINE
Title (fr)
PURIFICATION DE CYTOKINES MODIFIÉES
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 2009048239 W 20090623
- IN 1536CH2008 A 20080624
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2010008823A2] The invention provides an efficient method of purification of a modified cytokine. The process includes the use of a chromatographic technique for the purification of the desired cytokine. The purified cytokine can be used as a therapeutic composition.
IPC 8 full level
C07K 14/505 (2006.01); C07K 1/18 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
C07K 14/505 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [Y] WO 2006126066 A2 20061130 - AVESTHA GENGRAINE TECH PVT LTD [IN], et al
- [A] WO 2006105426 A2 20061005 - NEOSE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al
- [Y] CHUN-TING YUEN ET AL: "Relationships between the N-glycan structures and biological activities of recombinant human erythropoietins produced using different culture conditions and purification procedures", BRITISH JOURNAL OF HAEMATOLOGY, vol. 121, no. 3, 1 May 2003 (2003-05-01), pages 511 - 526, XP055024713, ISSN: 0007-1048, DOI: 10.1046/j.1365-2141.2003.04307.x
- [A] C. W. HANCHER ET AL: "Recovery of erythropoietin from anemic sheep plasma", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, vol. 16, no. 8, 1 August 1974 (1974-08-01), pages 1069 - 1079, XP055024530, ISSN: 0006-3592, DOI: 10.1002/bit.260160807
- [A] GUPTA S ET AL: "Screening and confirmation of recombinant human erythropoietin and darbepoietin-alpha in spiked plasma samples from drug-free horses", ANALYTICA CHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 552, no. 1-2, 3 November 2005 (2005-11-03), pages 96 - 109, XP027730216, ISSN: 0003-2670, [retrieved on 20051103]
- [A] ALOIS JUNGBAUER AND CHRISTINE MACHOLD: "Chapter 16: chromatography of proteins", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY LIBRARY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 69 Part B, 1 January 2004 (2004-01-01), pages 669 - 737, XP008150843, ISSN: 0301-4770, DOI: 10.1016/S0301-4770(04)80029-0
- See references of WO 2010008823A2
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2010008823 A2 20100121; WO 2010008823 A3 20100910; WO 2010008823 A8 20110127; BR PI0915394 A2 20170627; CN 102076705 A 20110525; EP 2307442 A2 20110413; EP 2307442 A4 20120530; JP 2011525492 A 20110922; MX 2010014180 A 20110215; RU 2011102447 A 20120727; US 2011098452 A1 20110428; US 8779110 B2 20140715
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 2009048239 W 20090623; BR PI0915394 A 20090623; CN 200980124118 A 20090623; EP 09798480 A 20090623; JP 2011514894 A 20090623; MX 2010014180 A 20090623; RU 2011102447 A 20090623; US 99729209 A 20090623