Global Patent Index - EP 2325205 A3

EP 2325205 A3 20111012 - Crystals of whole antibodies and fragments thereof and methods for making and using them

Title (en)

Crystals of whole antibodies and fragments thereof and methods for making and using them

Title (de)

Kristalle von ganzen Antikörpern und Fragmenten davon und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und Verwendung

Title (fr)

Cristaux d'anticorps complets et de fragments correspondants et leurs procédés de fabrication et d'utilisation

Publication

EP 2325205 A3 20111012 (EN)

Application

EP 10013049 A 20011226

Priority

  • EP 07003574 A 20011226
  • EP 01272485 A 20011226
  • US 25870400 P 20001228

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO02072636A2] Methods are also provided for preparing stabilized formulations of whole antibody crystals or antibody fragment crystals using pharmaceutical ingredients or excipients and optionally encapsulating the crystals or crystal formulations in a polymeric carrier to produce compositions and using such protein crystals for biomedical applications, including delivery of therapeutic proteins and vaccines.

IPC 8 full level

A61K 9/00 (2006.01); A61K 9/16 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 47/06 (2006.01); A61K 47/10 (2006.01); A61K 47/30 (2006.01); A61K 47/32 (2006.01); A61K 47/34 (2006.01); A61K 47/36 (2006.01); A61K 47/38 (2006.01); A61K 47/42 (2006.01); A61K 49/00 (2006.01); A61K 51/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/06 (2006.01); A61P 41/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 1/22 (2006.01); C07K 16/00 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); G01N 33/569 (2006.01); G01N 33/68 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP KR US)

A61K 9/0019 (2013.01 - EP US); A61K 9/1688 (2013.01 - EP US); A61K 47/10 (2013.01 - EP US); A61K 47/32 (2013.01 - EP US); A61K 47/34 (2013.01 - EP US); A61K 47/36 (2013.01 - EP US); A61P 9/00 (2017.12 - EP); A61P 11/00 (2017.12 - EP); A61P 29/00 (2017.12 - EP); A61P 35/00 (2017.12 - EP); A61P 37/06 (2017.12 - EP); A61P 41/00 (2017.12 - EP); A61P 43/00 (2017.12 - EP); C07K 16/00 (2013.01 - EP KR US); G01N 33/6854 (2013.01 - EP US); G01N 33/6857 (2013.01 - EP US); C07K 2299/00 (2013.01 - EP US); C07K 2317/732 (2013.01 - EP US); C07K 2317/734 (2013.01 - EP US); G01N 2469/10 (2013.01 - EP US)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] WO 9955310 A1 19991104 - ALTUS BIOLOGICS INC [US], et al
  • [Y] US 6140475 A 20001031 - MARGOLIN ALEXEY L [US], et al
  • [Y] WO 0077281 A1 20001221 - MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE], et al
  • [E] WO 02102303 A2 20021227 - MEDIMMUNE INC [US]
  • [Y] US 5605690 A 19970225 - JACOBS CINDY A [US], et al
  • [E] WO 02094264 A1 20021128 - TULARIK INC [US], et al
  • [A] KÜTTNER G ET AL: "A phage library-derived single-chain Fv fragment in complex with turkey egg-white lysozyme: characterization, crystallization and preliminary X-ray analysis.", MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY. ENGLAND FEB 1998, vol. 35, no. 3, February 1998 (1998-02-01), pages 189 - 194, XP002208333, ISSN: 0161-5890
  • [A] BOEHM M K ET AL: "Crystal structure of the anti-(carcinoembryonic antigen) single-chain Fv antibody MFE-23 and a model for antigen binding based on intermolecular contacts.", THE BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL 1 MAR 2000, vol. 346 Pt 2, 1 March 2000 (2000-03-01), pages 519 - 528, XP002431380, ISSN: 0264-6021
  • [Y] HARRIS L J ET AL: "Crystallographic structure of an intact IgG1 monoclonal antibody.", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY. ENGLAND 6 FEB 1998, vol. 275, no. 5, 6 February 1998 (1998-02-06), pages 861 - 872, XP004461446, ISSN: 0022-2836
  • [Y] BRADEN B C ET AL: "X-ray crystal structure of an anti-Buckminsterfullerene antibody fab fragment: biomolecular recognition of C(60).", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. UNITED STATES 24 OCT 2000, vol. 97, no. 22, 24 October 2000 (2000-10-24), pages 12193 - 12197, XP002208334, ISSN: 0027-8424
  • [Y] KUZNETSOV YU G ET AL: "Chimeric human-simian anti-CD4 antibodies form crystalline high symmetry particles", JOURNAL OF STRUCTURAL BIOLOGY, vol. 131, no. 2, August 2000 (2000-08-01), pages 108 - 115, XP002452896, ISSN: 1047-8477
  • [Y] HARRIS L J ET AL: "Comparison of intact antibody structures and the implications for effector function.", ADVANCES IN IMMUNOLOGY 1999, vol. 72, 1999, pages 191 - 208, XP009089990, ISSN: 0065-2776
  • [Y] VAN ASSCHE G ET AL: "Anti-TNF agents in Crohn's disease.", EXPERT OPINION ON INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS JAN 2000, vol. 9, no. 1, January 2000 (2000-01-01), pages 103 - 111, XP002452898, ISSN: 1354-3784
  • [Y] SCHWARZ E M ET AL: "Anti-TNF-alpha therapy as a clinical intervention for periprosthetic osteolysis", ARTHRITIS RESEARCH, CURRENT SCIENCE, LONDON,, GB, vol. 2, no. 3, March 2000 (2000-03-01), pages 165 - 168, XP002338975, ISSN: 1465-9905
  • [A] MCPHERSON A: "CRYSTALLIZATION OF MACROMOLECULES: GENERAL PRINCIPLES", METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS INC, SAN DIEGO, CA, US, vol. 114, 1985, pages 112 - 120, XP009001314, ISSN: 0076-6879
  • [Y] CHAYEN N E: "Recent advances in methodology for the crystallization of biological macromolecules", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 198-199, March 1999 (1999-03-01), pages 649 - 655, XP004170934, ISSN: 0022-0248
  • [A] "Crystal screen HT", USER GUIDE CRYSTAL SCREEN HT, XX, XX, 1 January 1991 (1991-01-01), pages 1 - 8, XP002961681
  • [Y] MEISSNER H C ET AL: "Immunoprophylaxix with palvizumab, a humanized respiratory respiratory, syncytical virus monoclonal antibody, for preventing of respiratory syntical virtus infection in high risk infants; a consensus opinion", THE PEDIATRIC INFECTIOUS DISEASE JOURNAL, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, US, vol. 18, no. 3, 1 March 1999 (1999-03-01), pages 223 - 231, XP002962232, ISSN: 0891-3668, DOI: 10.1097/00006454-199903000-00004
  • [Y] QUEEN C ET AL: "A humanized antibody that binds to the interleukin 2 receptor", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, WASHINGTON, DC; US, vol. 86, no. 24, 1 December 1989 (1989-12-01), pages 10029 - 10033, XP002614478, ISSN: 0027-8424, DOI: 10.1073/PNAS.86.24.10029
  • [Y] VINCENTI F ET AL: "INTERLEUKIN-2-RECEPTOR BLOCKADE WITH DACLIZUMAB TO PREVENT ACUTE REJECTION IN REAL TRANSPLANTATION", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, THE, MASSACHUSETTS MEDICAL SOCIETY, WALTHAM, MA, US, vol. 338, no. 3, 15 January 1998 (1998-01-15), pages 161 - 165, XP000876965, ISSN: 0028-4793, DOI: 10.1056/NEJM199801153380304
  • [Y] AL-LAZIKANI B ET AL: "Standard conformations for the canonical structures of immunoglobulins", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, vol. 273, no. 4, 7 November 1997 (1997-11-07), pages 927 - 948, XP004461383, ISSN: 0022-2836, DOI: 10.1006/JMBI.1997.1354
  • [YP] REICHERT J M: "MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES IN THE CLINIC DESPITE INITIAL TEETHING PROBLEMS, THE NUMBER OF CLINICALLY EFFECTIVE MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES IS GROWING", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 19, no. 9, 1 September 2001 (2001-09-01), pages 819 - 822, XP001156590, ISSN: 1087-0156, DOI: 10.1038/NBT0901-819
  • [Y] GARCIA K C ET AL: "Crystallization and preliminary X-ray diffraction data of an anti-angiotensin II Fab and of the peptide-Fab complex.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY 5 DEC 1989 LNKD- PUBMED:2584225, vol. 264, no. 34, 5 December 1989 (1989-12-05), pages 20463 - 20466, XP002657565, ISSN: 0021-9258
  • [Y] MCPHERSON A: "Current approaches to macromolecular crystallization.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY / FEBS 20 APR 1990 LNKD- PUBMED:2185018, vol. 189, no. 1, 20 April 1990 (1990-04-20), pages 1 - 23, XP002657566, ISSN: 0014-2956
  • [Y] KAHAN BARRY D ET AL: "Reduction of the occurrence of acute cellular rejection among renal allograft recipients treated with basiliximab, a chimeric anti-interleukin-2-receptor monoclonal antibody", TRANSPLANTATION (BALTIMORE), vol. 67, no. 2, 27 January 1999 (1999-01-27), pages 276 - 284, XP002657567, ISSN: 0041-1337
  • [Y] CURLEY G P ET AL: "Integrin antagonists", CELLULAR AND MOLECULAR LIFE SCIENCES 1999 CH LNKD- DOI:10.1007/S000180050443, vol. 56, no. 5-6, 1999, pages 427 - 441, XP002657568, ISSN: 1420-682X

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

DOCDB simple family (publication)

WO 02072636 A2 20020919; WO 02072636 A3 20030417; WO 02072636 A8 20040226; AU 2002256971 B2 20080403; CA 2433353 A1 20020919; CA 2433353 C 20170321; EP 1345968 A2 20030924; EP 2325205 A2 20110525; EP 2325205 A3 20111012; IL 156618 A0 20040104; JP 2005502589 A 20050127; JP 4731793 B2 20110727; KR 100923514 B1 20091027; KR 20030074693 A 20030919; KR 20080043858 A 20080519; KR 20100031769 A 20100324; NZ 526720 A 20071130; US 2002136719 A1 20020926; US 2009093617 A1 20090409; US 7833525 B2 20101116; US 9310379 B2 20160412; ZA 200305035 B 20051130

DOCDB simple family (application)

US 0149628 W 20011226; AU 2002256971 A 20011226; CA 2433353 A 20011226; EP 01272485 A 20011226; EP 10013049 A 20011226; IL 15661801 A 20011226; JP 2002571549 A 20011226; KR 20037008836 A 20030628; KR 20087007422 A 20011226; KR 20107002834 A 20011226; NZ 52672001 A 20011226; US 23791708 A 20080925; US 3495001 A 20011226; ZA 200305035 A 20030627