EP 2338054 A1 20110629 - KIDNEY CELL CARCINOMA
Title (en)
KIDNEY CELL CARCINOMA
Title (de)
NIERENZELLKARZINOM
Title (fr)
CARCINOME À CELLULES RÉNALES
Publication
Application
Priority
- EP 2009062072 W 20090917
- EP 08164519 A 20080917
- EP 09783135 A 20090917
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2010031822A1] The method for diagnosing a kidney cell carcinoma comprises the step of determining a presence or non-presence or amplitude of at least three polypeptide markers in a urine sample, wherein the polypeptide markers are selected from the markers that are characterized in Table 1 by values for molecular weight and migration time.
IPC 8 full level
G01N 33/574 (2006.01); G01N 33/68 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
G01N 33/493 (2013.01 - EP US); G01N 33/57438 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
See references of WO 2010031822A1
Citation (examination)
- NICCOLÒ BOSSO ET AL: "Human urine biomarkers of renal cell carcinoma evaluated by ClinProt", PROTEOMICS - CLINICAL APPLICATIONS, vol. 2, no. 7-8, 1 July 2008 (2008-07-01), pages 1036 - 1046, XP055018754, ISSN: 1862-8346, DOI: 10.1002/prca.200780139
- SHERIEF ET AL: "Matrix Metalloproteinase Activity in Urine of Patients with Renal Cell Carcinoma Leads to Degradation of Extracellular Matrix proteins: possible use as a Screening Assay", JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, vol. 169, no. 4, 1 April 2003 (2003-04-01), pages 1530 - 1534, XP005536273, ISSN: 0022-5347, DOI: 10.1097/01.JU.0000049201.91150.9D
- WU DENG-LONG ET AL: "[Screening urine markers of renal cell carcinoma using SELDI-TOF-MS]", ZHONGHUA YIXUE ZAZHI - NATIONAL MEDICAL JOURNAL OF CHINA, BEIJING, CH, vol. 84, no. 13, 2 July 2004 (2004-07-02), pages 1092 - 1095, XP009156308, ISSN: 0376-2491
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
AL BA RS
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2010031822 A1 20100325; EP 2338054 A1 20110629; US 2011214990 A1 20110908; US 2015024970 A1 20150122
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 2009062072 W 20090917; EP 09783135 A 20090917; US 200913119374 A 20090917; US 201414503617 A 20141001