EP 2351408 A4 20160824 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT IN A TELECOMMUNICATION SYSTEM
Title (en)
METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT IN A TELECOMMUNICATION SYSTEM
Title (de)
VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG IN EINEM TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM
Title (fr)
PROCÉDÉ ET AGENCEMENT DANS UN SYSTÈME DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATION
Publication
Application
Priority
- SE 2009051050 W 20090922
- US 11282608 P 20081110
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2010053426A2] The present invention provides a higher protocol layer, e.g. Layer 3, filter mechanism, where a counter mechanism applied in the filter adapts an incremental or decrementalprocess of the relevant counter or counters to the inter-arrival time of the consecutive out of synch resp. in synch indications from a lower protocol layer, e.g. Layer 1, since the indications from the lower protocol layer may arrive to the higher-layers with irregular arrival times.
IPC 8 full level
H04W 56/00 (2009.01); H04L 29/08 (2006.01); H04W 76/02 (2009.01); H04W 76/04 (2009.01); H04W 76/06 (2009.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
H04L 69/32 (2013.01 - EP US); H04W 56/00 (2013.01 - EP US); H04W 76/28 (2018.02 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [A] ERICSSON: "E-UTRA Out-of-Sync and In-Sync Requirements in DRX", 3GPP DRAFT; R4-082490_OUT_OF_SYNC_DETECTION_DRX, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, no. Scotland; 20080926, 26 September 2008 (2008-09-26), XP050325750
- [A] MOTOROLA: "Further details on out-of-sync and in-sync detection", 3GPP DRAFT; R4-082560, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, no. Scotland; 20080928, 28 September 2008 (2008-09-28), XP050325811
- [A] NOKIA: "Radio link problem detection", 3GPP DRAFT; R4-082439, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, no. Scotland; 20080928, 28 September 2008 (2008-09-28), XP050325703
- [A] ERICSSON: "Radio Link Monitoring Minimum Requirements", 3GPP DRAFT; R4-083004_CR_RADIO_LINK_MONITORING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20081103, 3 November 2008 (2008-11-03), XP050326208
- [A] ERICSSON: "LTE Radio Link Failure Detection", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-086419, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20081104, 4 November 2008 (2008-11-04), XP050321381
- [A] "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Physical layer procedures (FDD) (Release 8)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 25.214, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, no. V8.3.0, 1 September 2008 (2008-09-01), pages 1 - 89, XP050366888
- [A] "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Radio Resource Control (RRC); Protocol Specification (Release 8)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 25.331, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, no. V8.4.0, 1 September 2008 (2008-09-01), pages 1 - 1543, XP050368024
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2010053426 A2 20100514; WO 2010053426 A3 20100708; EP 2351408 A2 20110803; EP 2351408 A4 20160824; US 2011217973 A1 20110908
DOCDB simple family (application)
SE 2009051050 W 20090922; EP 09825054 A 20090922; US 200913128276 A 20090922