EP 2359435 A4 20120912 - COMPACT MULTIBEAM REFLECTOR ANTENNA
Title (en)
COMPACT MULTIBEAM REFLECTOR ANTENNA
Title (de)
KOMPAKTE MEHRSTRAHL-REFLEKTORANTENNE
Title (fr)
ANTENNE À RÉFLECTEUR MULTIFAISCEAU COMPACTE
Publication
Application
Priority
- KR 2009006600 W 20091111
- RU 2008145112 U 20081117
- KR 20090089956 A 20090923
IPC 8 full level
H01Q 19/19 (2006.01); H01Q 25/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
H01Q 19/19 (2013.01); H01Q 25/007 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [A] US 5136294 A 19920804 - IWATA RYUICHI [JP]
- [A] US 6211834 B1 20010403 - DURHAM TIMOTHY E [US], et al
- [A] IWATA R: "Composite parabola dual beam antenna with a phase compensation subreflector", ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM, 1989. AP-S. DIGEST, IEEE, 26 June 1989 (1989-06-26), pages 1594 - 1597vol.3, XP032148798, DOI: 10.1109/APS.1989.135030
- [A] SANAD M ED - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS: "DESIGN OF QUAD-BAND REFLECTOR ANTENNAS WITHOUT USING FREQUENCY SELECTIVE SURFACES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM (APSIS). ANN ARBOR, JUNE 28 - JULY 2, 1993; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM (APSIS)], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, vol. 2, 28 June 1993 (1993-06-28), pages 804 - 807, XP000420001
- [A] PEREIRA L C P ET AL: "Horn subreflector blockage effects in the analysis of earth station antenna sidelobe performance", 19880606; 19880606 - 19880610, 6 June 1988 (1988-06-06), pages 875 - 878, XP010073519
- See references of WO 2010056029A2
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 09826261 A 20091111