EP 2361458 A4 20140709 - DECODING METHOD AND DECODING DEVICE
Title (en)
DECODING METHOD AND DECODING DEVICE
Title (de)
ENTSCHLÜSSELUNGSVERFAHREN UND ENTSCHLÜSSELUNGSVORRICHTUNG
Title (fr)
PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCODAGE ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉCODAGE
Publication
Application
Priority
- JP 2009067947 W 20091009
- AU 2008906238 A 20081202
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2010064496A1] The decoding method comprises storing, successively performing, determining, first performing, second performing, and outputting. The storing stores the N received branchwords in memory. The successively performing performs Viterbi updates on a sequence of branchwords. The determining determines a first encoder state at the end of the third block most likely to have generated the final branchword in the sequence from the best path metric. The first performing performs a Viterbi traceback procedure from the first encoder state at the end of the third block to determine a second encoder state at the start of the third block of branchwords. The second performing performs a Viterbi traceback procedure from that second encoder state at the start of the third block to determine a third encoder state at the start of the second block of branchwords. The outputting outputs a derived tail-biting path, if the second and third encoder states are identical.
IPC 8 full level
H03M 13/41 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
H03M 13/413 (2013.01); H03M 13/4169 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [I] US 2008250303 A1 20081009 - CHAE SU-CHANG [KR], et al
- [A] US 5349589 A 19940920 - CHENNAKESHU SANDEEP [US], et al
- [I] COX R V ET AL: "A CIRCULAR VITERBI ALGORITHM FOR DECODING TAILBITING CONVOLUTIONAL CODES", PROCEEDINGS OF 43TH IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE (VTC), 18-20 MAY 1998, SECAUCUS, NJ, USA, 18 May 1993 (1993-05-18), pages 104 - 107, XP000393135, ISBN: 978-0-7803-1267-8
- [I] WANG Y-P E ET AL: "To bite or not to bite-a study of tail bits versus tail-biting", SEVENTH IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS, PIMRC'96, TAIPEI, TAIWAN 15-18 OCT. 1996, vol. 2, 15 October 1996 (1996-10-15), pages 317 - 321, XP010209183, ISBN: 978-0-7803-3692-6, DOI: 10.1109/PIMRC.1996.567407
- [A] BILL WILKIE, BETH COWIE: "Viterbi Decoder Block Decoding - Trellis Termination and Tail Biting", 14 February 2005 (2005-02-14), XP055120764, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://tec.icbuy.com/uploads/2010/5/17/xapp551.pdf> [retrieved on 20140528]
- See references of WO 2010064496A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2010064496 A1 20100610; CN 102282771 A 20111214; CN 102282771 B 20141008; EP 2361458 A1 20110831; EP 2361458 A4 20140709; HK 1165111 A1 20120928; JP 2012510735 A 20120510; JP 5370487 B2 20131218
DOCDB simple family (application)
JP 2009067947 W 20091009; CN 200980147990 A 20091009; EP 09830264 A 20091009; HK 12105209 A 20120531; JP 2011524036 A 20091009