EP 2362909 A4 20121010 - MAMMALIAN GENES INVOLVED IN INFECTION
Title (en)
MAMMALIAN GENES INVOLVED IN INFECTION
Title (de)
AN INFEKTIONEN BETEILIGTE SÄUGERGENE
Title (fr)
GÈNES MAMMALIENS INTERVENANT DANS UNE INFECTION
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 2009058947 W 20090930
- US 19477408 P 20080930
- US 19577008 P 20081009
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2010039778A2] The present invention relates to nucleic acid sequences and cellular proteins encoded by these sequences that are involved in infection or are otherwise associated with the life cycle of one or more pathogens.
IPC 8 full level
C12N 15/113 (2010.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
A61K 31/00 (2013.01); C12N 15/113 (2013.01); C12Q 1/18 (2013.01); C12Y 601/01005 (2013.01); G01N 33/56983 (2013.01); C12N 2310/14 (2013.01); C12N 2330/31 (2013.01); Y02A 50/30 (2017.12)
Citation (search report)
- [A] CLAYTON F ET AL: "Gp120-induced Bob/GPR15 activation: a possible cause of human immunodeficiency virus enteropathy.", THE AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, vol. 159, no. 5, November 2001 (2001-11-01), pages 1933 - 1939, XP002682331, ISSN: 0002-9440
- [A] D. MCDONALD: "Visualization of the intracellular behavior of HIV in living cells", THE JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, vol. 159, no. 3, 11 November 2002 (2002-11-11), pages 441 - 452, XP055036240, ISSN: 0021-9525, DOI: 10.1083/jcb.200203150
- [A] KENNEY SHANNON: "Theodore E. Woodward Award: development of novel, EBV-targeted therapies for EBV-positive tumors.", TRANSACTIONS OF THE AMERICAN CLINICAL AND CLIMATOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION, vol. 117, 2006, pages 55 - 74, XP002682332, ISSN: 0065-7778
- [A] W. ZHANG ET AL: "RNA Interference Inhibits Respiratory Syncytial Virus Replication and Disease Pathogenesis without Inhibiting Priming of the Memory Immune Response", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, vol. 82, no. 24, 25 September 2008 (2008-09-25), pages 12221 - 12231, XP055036354, ISSN: 0022-538X, DOI: 10.1128/JVI.01557-08
- See references of WO 2010039778A2
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2010039778 A2 20100408; WO 2010039778 A3 20100916; EP 2362909 A2 20110907; EP 2362909 A4 20121010
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 2009058947 W 20090930; EP 09818408 A 20090930