Global Patent Index - EP 2363567 A3

EP 2363567 A3 2013-09-25 - Frame of a plastic window or a plastic door as well as centre seal for it

Title (en)

Frame of a plastic window or a plastic door as well as centre seal for it

Title (de)

Rahmen eines Kunststofffensters oder einer Kunststofftür sowie Mitteldichtung hierfür

Title (fr)

Cadre d'une fenêtre en matière synthétique ou d'une porte en matière synthétique ainsi que joint central associé

Publication

EP 2363567 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 11000927 A

Priority

DE 202010003212 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2363567A2] The frame (2) has a blind frame part (3) and a casement frame part (4) with plastic blind frame profiles and plastic casement frame profiles, and a central seal (5) arranged in a folding area (9) between the frame parts. The seal has a base body (10) and a lip (11) resting at stop surfaces of the casement frame part by forming an area-sided circular chamber (13) and a ventilation-sided circular chamber (14). The seal has a rim (12) that is turned towards the casement frame part and arranged at a distance to the lip, where the rim does not rest against the casement frame part.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/23 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/2312 (2013.01); E06B 3/22 (2013.01); E06B 7/2305 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26321 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

EP 2363567 A2 20110907; EP 2363567 A3 20130925; DE 202010003212 U1 20110817; EA 022234 B1 20151130; EA 201100324 A1 20111031; UA 107915 C2 20150310

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-11 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20180313

2016-10-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20160902

2014-04-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20140320

2014-04-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2013-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2013-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME

2013-09-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E06B 7/23 20060101AFI20130820BHEP

2011-09-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2011-09-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME