Global Patent Index - EP 2369277 A3

EP 2369277 A3 2013-09-18 - Bottle storage device

Title (en)

Bottle storage device

Title (de)

Flaschenlagervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de stockage de bouteilles

Publication

EP 2369277 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 11155723 A

Priority

DE 202010004055 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2369277A2] The device has a built-in part (11) connected to a lower shelf (1) to form a storage compartment for horizontal storage of bottle-like chilled goods (14). The built-in part comprises a bulkhead (12) that protects the chilled goods accommodated in the storage compartment from direct impact of cool air. The bulkhead forms a rear wall of the storage compartment. The built-in part is made of plastic or an up-foamed material. Multiple gutters are arranged next to each other and formed in a base plate (13) of the built-in part.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 25/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 25/021 (2013.01); F25D 2331/803 (2013.01); F25D 2331/809 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

DE 202010004055 U1 20100624; EP 2369277 A2 20110928; EP 2369277 A3 20130918

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160531

2016-02-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20160120

2015-03-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2014-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20140318

2014-04-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2013-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2013-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: BA ME

2013-09-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F25D 25/02 20060101AFI20130809BHEP

2011-09-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2011-09-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: BA ME