Global Patent Index - EP 2375212 B1

EP 2375212 B1 2017-10-04 - Barrel for firearms

Title (en)

Barrel for firearms

Title (de)

Lauf für Feuerwaffen

Title (fr)

Canon pour armes à feu

Publication

EP 2375212 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 11450040 A

Priority

AT 5502010 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2736319A1] Gun barrel for firearms made from a deformed material and method for producing the gun barrel material. The material has a chemical composition in % by weight of. (see above table) and impurities due to smelting. The material has a hardness of at least 46 to 48 HRC.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 21/20 (2006.01); C21D 1/25 (2006.01); C21D 9/10 (2006.01); C22C 38/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 21/20 (2013.01); C21D 1/25 (2013.01); C21D 9/10 (2013.01); C22C 38/02 (2013.01); C22C 38/04 (2013.01); C22C 38/22 (2013.01); C22C 38/24 (2013.01); C21D 1/773 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

AT 508777 A4 20110415; AT 508777 B1 20110415; AR 081131 A1 20120627; BR PI1101832 A2 20120821; CA 2736319 A1 20111006; CA 2736319 C 20140128; DK 2375212 T3 20180108; EP 2375212 A2 20111012; EP 2375212 A3 20140716; EP 2375212 B1 20171004; EP 2375212 B8 20180117; ES 2654650 T3 20180214; HR P20171994 T1 20180209; HU E035986 T2 20180628; LT 2375212 T 20180110; PL 2375212 T3 20180430; PT 2375212 T 20180109; RS 56662 B1 20180330; SI 2375212 T1 20180430; US 2011253270 A1 20111020; US 8372219 B2 20130212

INPADOC legal status


2018-09-28 [PG25 MT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171004

2018-09-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20180705

2018-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180423

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-07-31 [PGFP SK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Payment date: 20180305

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-07-31 [PGFP NO] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NO

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-07-05 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502011013079

2018-06-28 [REG HU AG4A] FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS

- Document: HU E035986

2018-06-01 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20170403607

- Effective date: 20180518

2018-06-01 [REG SK T3] TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAKIAN

- Document: SK E 26642

2018-05-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-05-31 [PGFP HR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: HR

- Payment date: 20180306

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20180307

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-05-31 [PGFP RS] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: RS

- Payment date: 20180302

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-05-31 [PGFP IS] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Payment date: 20180319

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-05-31 [PGFP SM] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SM

- Payment date: 20180328

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-05-31 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20180314

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-05-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-05-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20180315

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-05-31 [PGFP EE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-05-31 [PGFP BG] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-05-31 [PGFP LV] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-05-31 [PGFP SI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Payment date: 20180305

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-05-31 [PGFP HU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Payment date: 20180302

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180320

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-04-30 [PGFP RO] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Payment date: 20180306

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20180320

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-04-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-04-30 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20180302

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-04-30 [PGFP LT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Payment date: 20180305

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-04-15 [REG AT HC] CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS

- Owner name: BOEHLER EDELSTAHL GMBH & CO KG, AT

- Document: AT 934458 T

- Effective date: 20180308

2018-03-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-03-15 [REG EE FG4A] TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA

- Document: EE E014957

- Effective date: 20171218

2018-02-27 [REG SE RPOT] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED WITH A CORRECTED SWEDISH TRANSLATION (OLD LAW)

2018-02-26 [REG NO T2] ENTRY OF EP PATENT INTO NATIONAL PHASE OF NORWAY

- Effective date: 20171004

2018-02-14 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2654650 T3

- Effective date: 20180214

2018-01-31 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

- Free text: BERICHTIGUNG INHABER

2018-01-10 [REG NL FP] TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)

2018-01-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BOEHLER EDELSTAHL GMBH & CO KG

2018-01-09 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Document: PT 2375212 T 20180109

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20171227

2018-01-08 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

- Effective date: 20180103

2018-01-03 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BOEHLER EDELSTAHL GMBH & CO KG, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BOEHLER EDELSTAHL GMBH, KAPFENBERG, AT

- Document: DE 502011013079

2018-01-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502011013079

- Representative's name: PATRONUS IP PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

2018-01-02 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2017-12-13 [REG RO EPE] EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA

2017-11-16 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502011013079

2017-11-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2017-10-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 934458 T

- Effective date: 20171015

2017-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-05-24 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170502

2015-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20150113

2015-02-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2014-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2014-07-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME

2014-07-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C22C 38/22 20060101ALI20140611BHEP

2014-07-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C21D 1/25 20060101ALI20140611BHEP

2014-07-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C21D 9/10 20060101ALI20140611BHEP

2014-07-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F41A 21/20 20060101AFI20140611BHEP

2011-10-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2011-10-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME