Global Patent Index - EP 2383684 A1

EP 2383684 A1 20111102 - Method and device for generating an ontology document

Title (en)

Method and device for generating an ontology document

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung eines Ontologiedokuments

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour générer une document d'ontologie

Publication

EP 2383684 A1 20111102 (EN)

Application

EP 10161690 A 20100430

Priority

EP 10161690 A 20100430

Abstract (en)

A computer-implemented method is provided for generating an ontology document, the method comprising inputting a domain description including information about items in the domain and relationships between the items; accessing a data structure and an operation structure, wherein the data structure is a domain-independent model of items and relationships between items, the data structure comprising at least progenitor items each able to contain only progeny items created by the progenitor item as a consequence of the progenitor item accepting an operation from the operation structure invoked against it, the operation structure also being domain-independent; and applying the data structure and the operation structure to the domain description to generate an ontology document for use in producing a software artefact.

IPC 8 full level

G06N 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP US)

G06F 16/367 (2019.01 - EP US); G06N 5/02 (2013.01 - EP US)

Citation (search report)

  • [I] C. PEDRINACI, J. DOMINGUE, R. KRUMMENACHER: "Services and the web of data: an unexploited symbiosis", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2010 AAAI SPRING SYMPOSIUM SERIES: 22-24 MARCH 2010, 22 March 2010 (2010-03-22), pages 99 - 100, XP002607097, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.aaai.org/ocs/index.php/SSS/SSS10/paper/view/1129/1457> [retrieved on 20100323]
  • [I] P. JAIN, P. HITZLER, P. Z. YEH, K. VERMA, A. P. SHETH: "Linked data is merely more data", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2010 AAAI SPRING SYMPOSIUM SERIES: 22-24 MARCH 2010, 22 March 2010 (2010-03-22), pages 82 - 86, XP002607098, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.aaai.org/ocs/index.php/SSS/SSS10/paper/view/1130/1454> [retrieved on 20100323]
  • [I] W. VAMBENEPE: "REST in practice for IT and Cloud management (part 3: wrap-up)", WILLIAM VAMBENEPE'S BLOG 'IT MANAGEMENT IN A CHANGING IT WORLD', 10 December 2009 (2009-12-10), XP002607099, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://stage.vambenepe.com/archives/1161> [retrieved on 20100301]
  • [A] W. VAMBENEPE: "Review of Fujitsu's IaaS cloud API submission to DMTF", WILLIAM VAMBENEPE'S BLOG 'IT MANAGEMENT IN A CHANGING IT WORLD', 19 November 2009 (2009-11-19), XP002607100, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://stage.vambenepe.com/archives/1108> [retrieved on 20100215]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA ME RS

DOCDB simple family (publication)

EP 2383684 A1 20111102; JP 2011238223 A 20111124; JP 5672134 B2 20150218; US 2011271176 A1 20111103; US 8898103 B2 20141125

DOCDB simple family (application)

EP 10161690 A 20100430; JP 2011101835 A 20110428; US 201113182882 A 20110714