EP 2389953 A1 20111130 - Method of inhibiting receptor tyrosine kinases with an extracellular antagonist and an intracellular antagonist
Title (en)
Method of inhibiting receptor tyrosine kinases with an extracellular antagonist and an intracellular antagonist
Title (de)
Verfahren zur Hemmung von Rezeptor-Tyrosinkinasen mit einem extrazellulären Antagonisten und einem intrazellulären Antagonisten
Title (fr)
Procédé d'inhibition de kinases de tyrosine de récepteur avec un antagoniste extracellulaire et antagoniste intracellulaire
Publication
Application
Priority
- EP 04754904 A 20040609
- US 47779603 P 20030609
Abstract (en)
The present invention relates to methods of inhibiting receptor tyrosine kinases by utilizing a combination of both an extracellular and an intracellular RTK antagonist. The extracellular RTK antagonist is a biological molecule or a small molecule that inhibits activation of the receptor tyrosine kinase by interacting with the extracellular binding region of the receptor. The intracellular RTK antagonist is a biological molecule or small molecule that inhibits tyrosine kinase activity of the receptor tyrosine kinase by interacting with the receptor's intracellular region bearing a kinase domain or by interacting with an intracellular protein involved in the signaling pathway of the receptor tyrosine kinase. The present invention also provides methods of treating tyrosine kinase-dependent diseases, and compositions for use in such methods thereof, by administering a combination of both an extracellular and an intracellular RTK antagonist.
IPC 8 full level
A61K 39/385 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01)
IPC 8 main group level
C12N (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
A61K 39/385 (2013.01 - EP US); A61K 39/39558 (2013.01 - EP US); A61K 45/06 (2013.01 - EP US); A61P 9/00 (2017.12 - EP); A61P 35/00 (2017.12 - EP); A61P 35/02 (2017.12 - EP); A61P 43/00 (2017.12 - EP); C07K 16/26 (2013.01 - EP US); C07K 16/2863 (2013.01 - EP US); A61K 2039/505 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (applicant)
- US 4943533 A 19900724 - MENDELSOHN JOHN [US], et al
- US 6217866 B1 20010417 - SELA MICHAEL [IL], et al
- US 97306598 A 19980319
- US 63597400 A 20000809
- WO 9960023 A1 19991125 - IMCLONE SYSTEMS INC [US], et al
- WO 0069459 A1 20001123 - IMCLONE SYSTEMS INC [US]
- US 6235883 B1 20010522 - JAKOBOVITS AYA [US], et al
- WO 0189566 A1 20011129 - GENENTECH INC [US]
- US 5558864 A 19960924 - BENDIG MARY M [GB], et al
- US 5884093 A 19990316 - BERENGUEL LEO P [US], et al
- US 5891996 A 19990406 - MATEO DE ACOSTA DEL RIO CRISTI [CU], et al
- WO 9822616 A1 19980528 - KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP], et al
- WO 9959636 A1 19991125 - KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP], et al
- AU 5066698 A 19980610 - KYOWA HAKKO KIRIN CO LTD
- CA 2328893 A1 19991125 - KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]
- WO 0044777 A1 20000803 - IMCLONE SYSTEMS INC [US], et al
- WO 0190192 A2 20011129 - IMCLONE SYSTEMS INC [US], et al
- US 81359391 A 19911224
- US 90639792 A 19920626
- US 94650792 A 19920917
- US 97745192 A 19921119
- US 5526993 A 19930430
- US 25251794 A 19941031
- US 60189196 A 19960215
- US 2132498 A 19980210
- US 20878698 A 19981210
- US 91940801 A 20010731
- US 5840301 A 19981124 - ROCKWELL PATRICIA [US], et al
- US 70680496 A 19960903
- US 86696997 A 19970602
- US 96711397 A 19971110
- US 4780798 A 19980325
- US 40116399 A 19990922
- US 79868901 A 20010302
- US 0106966 W 20010305
- US 5861301 A 19990119 - TERMAN BRUCE ISRAEL [US], et al
- WO 9410202 A1 19940511 - GENENTECH INC [US]
- WO 9521865 A1 19950817 - LUDWIG INST CANCER RES [US], et al
- US 9501678 W 19950210
- US 97678701 A 20011012
- US 6177401 B1 20010123 - ULLRICH AXEL [DE], et al
- US 5712395 A 19980127 - APP HARALD [US], et al
- US 5981569 A 19991109 - APP HARALD [US], et al
- US 86519801 A 20010524
- US 30129901 P 20010626
- US 5616582 A 19970401 - BARKER ANDREW J [GB]
- WO 9633980 A1 19961031 - ZENECA LTD [GB], et al
- WO 9630347 A1 19961003 - PFIZER [US], et al
- US 5679683 A 19971021 - BRIDGES ALEXANDER JAMES [US], et al
- US 5196446 A 19930323 - LEVITZKI ALEXANDER [US], et al
- WO 9116051 A1 19911031 - RORER INT HOLDINGS [US]
- WO 9727199 A1 19970731 - CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al
- WO 9730034 A1 19970821 - ZENECA LTD [GB]
- WO 9742187 A1 19971113 - ZENECA LTD [GB], et al
- WO 9749688 A1 19971231 - PFIZER [US], et al
- WO 9833798 A2 19980806 - WARNER LAMBERT CO [US], et al
- WO 0018761 A1 20000406 - AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]
- WO 0031048 A1 20000602 - WARNER LAMBERT CO [US], et al
- US 5656655 A 19970812 - SPADA ALFRED P [US], et al
- US 5646153 A 19970708 - SPADA ALFRED P [US], et al
- US 6365157 B2 20020402 - ROCKWELL PATRICIA [US], et al
- US 31228699 A 19990514
- BRFGGEMANN, TAUSSIG, CURR. OPIN. BIOTECHNOL., vol. 8, 1997, pages 455 - 458
- PEARSON, LIPMAN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, vol. 85, 1988, pages 2444 - 8
- YANG ET AL., CRITICAL REV. ONCOL.LHEMATOL., vol. 38, no. 1, 2001, pages 17 - 23
- TERMAN ET AL., ONCOGENE, vol. 6, September 1991 (1991-09-01), pages 1677 - 1683
- GANESAN, DRUG DISCOV. TODAY, vol. 7, no. 1, January 2002 (2002-01-01), pages 47 - 55
- LOU, DRUG DISCOV. TODAY, vol. 6, no. 24, December 2001 (2001-12-01), pages 1288 - 1294
- ROWINSKY ET AL., 37TH ANNUAL MEETING OF ASCO, SAN FRANCISCO, 12 May 2001 (2001-05-12)
- ANIDO ET AL., 37TH ANNUAL MEETING OF ASCO, SAN FRANCISCO, 12 May 2001 (2001-05-12)
- MOYER ET AL., CANCER RES., vol. 57, 1997, pages 4838 - 48
- POLLACK ET AL., J. PHARMACOL., vol. 291, 1999, pages 739 - 48
- HIDALGO ET AL., 37TH ANNUAL MEETING OF ASCO, SAN FRANCISCO, 12 May 2001 (2001-05-12)
- FRY ET AL., SCIENCE, vol. 265, August 1994 (1994-08-01), pages 1093 - 1095
- OSHEROV ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., vol. 268, no. 15, 1993, pages 11134 - 11142
- PANEK ET AL., J. PHARM AND EXP. THERAPEUTICS, vol. 283, no. 3, 1997, pages 1433 - 1444
- PANEK ET AL., J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THERA., vol. 283, 1997, pages 1433 - 44
- BATLEY ET AL., LIFE SCI., vol. 62, 1998, pages 143 - 50
- SAMBROOK, J. ET AL.: "Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual", 1989, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS
- GRANDIS ET AL., CANCER, vol. 78, 1996, pages 1284 - 92
- SHIMIZU ET AL., JAPAN J. CANCER RES., vol. 85, 1994, pages 567 - 71
- SAUTER ET AL., AM. J. PATH., vol. 148, 1996, pages 1047 - 53
- COLLINS, GLIA, vol. 15, 1995, pages 289 - 96
- RADINSKY ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., vol. 1, 1995, pages 19 - 31
- PETRIDES ET AL., CANCER RES., vol. 50, 1990, pages 3934 - 39
- HOFFMANN ET AL., ANTICANCER RES., vol. 17, 1997, pages 4419 - 26
- WIKSTRAND ET AL., CANCER RES., vol. 55, 1995, pages 3140 - 48
- PEDERSEN ET AL., ANN. ONCOL., vol. 12, no. 6, 2001, pages 745 - 60
- WIKSTRAND ET AL., CANCER RES., vol. 55, 1995, pages 3140 - 8
- LARRIVEE ET AL., INT'L J. MOL. MED., vol. 5, 2000, pages 447 - 56
Citation (search report)
- [X] NORMANNO N ET AL: "Cooperative inhibitory effect of ZD1839 (Iressa) in combination with trastuzumab (Herceptin) on human breast cancer cell growth", ANNALS OF ONCOLOGY, KLUWER, DORDRECHT, NL, vol. 13, no. 1, January 2002 (2002-01-01), pages 65 - 72, XP002302015, ISSN: 0923-7534
- [X] SCHILLER JOAN H: "New directions for ZD1839 in the treatment of solid tumors.", SEMINARS IN ONCOLOGY FEB 2003, vol. 30, no. 1 Suppl 1, February 2003 (2003-02-01), pages 49 - 55, XP009052600, ISSN: 0093-7754
- [XI] CIARDIELLO F ET AL: "ANTI-EPIDERMAL GROWTH FACTOR RECEPTOR DRUGS IN CANCER THERAPY", EXPERT OPINION ON INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS, ASHLEY PUBLICATIONS LTD., LONDON, GB, vol. 11, no. 6, 1 June 2002 (2002-06-01), pages 755 - 768, XP009014333, ISSN: 1354-3784, DOI: 10.1517/13543784.11.6.755
- [X] COHEN ROGER B: "Epidermal growth factor receptor as a therapeutic target in colorectal cancer.", CLINICAL COLORECTAL CANCER FEB 2003 LNKD- PUBMED:12620146, vol. 2, no. 4, February 2003 (2003-02-01), pages 246 - 251, XP009052900, ISSN: 1533-0028
- [T] HUANG SHYHMIN ET AL: "Dual-agent molecular targeting of the epidermal growth factor receptor (EGFR): Combining anti-EGFR antibody with tyrosine kinase inhibitor", CANCER RESEARCH, vol. 64, no. 15, 1 August 2004 (2004-08-01), pages 5355 - 5362, XP002399541, ISSN: 0008-5472
- [T] GUARINO MICHAEL J ET AL: "Dual inhibition of the epidermal growth factor receptor pathway with cetuximab and erlotinib: a phase I study in patients with advanced solid malignancies.", THE ONCOLOGIST FEB 2009 LNKD- PUBMED:19182243, vol. 14, no. 2, February 2009 (2009-02-01), pages 119 - 124, XP002661342, ISSN: 1549-490X
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
AL HR LT LV MK
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2005001053 A2 20050106; WO 2005001053 A3 20050811; BR PI0411250 A 20060829; CA 2528961 A1 20050106; CN 101966338 A 20110209; CN 1972712 A 20070530; EP 1638600 A2 20060329; EP 1638600 A4 20080611; EP 2389953 A1 20111130; IL 172473 A0 20060410; JP 2007500248 A 20070111; JP 2012211158 A 20121101; RU 2006100030 A 20070720; RU 2011122542 A 20121220; RU 2431500 C2 20111020; TN SN05315 A1 20070710; US 2007036795 A1 20070215; US 2009232805 A1 20090917; US 2012201817 A1 20120809
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 2004018451 W 20040609; BR PI0411250 A 20040609; CA 2528961 A 20040609; CN 200480022754 A 20040609; CN 201010505934 A 20040609; EP 04754904 A 20040609; EP 11004531 A 20040609; IL 17247305 A 20051208; JP 2006533679 A 20040609; JP 2012134885 A 20120614; RU 2006100030 A 20040609; RU 2011122542 A 20110606; TN SN05315 A 20051208; US 201213445239 A 20120412; US 36135009 A 20090128; US 56020904 A 20040609