Global Patent Index - EP 2410282 B1

EP 2410282 B1 2017-10-11 - Warhead

Title (en)

Warhead

Title (de)

Gefechtskopf

Title (fr)

Ogive

Publication

EP 2410282 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 11005696 A

Priority

DE 102010027577 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2410282A2] The warhead (1) has a warhead housing (2), in which a projectile-formed explosive charge is arranged, where an explosive (9) is provided with a metal coating (10). A blind (6), which fragments the metal coating that is deformed during the ignition of the explosive, is brought before the metal coating according to the requirement.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 1/02 (2006.01); F42B 12/10 (2006.01); F42B 12/22 (2006.01); F42B 12/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/10 (2013.01); F42B 1/02 (2013.01); F42B 1/036 (2013.01); F42B 12/207 (2013.01); F42B 12/22 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 2410282 A2 20120125; EP 2410282 A3 20141022; EP 2410282 B1 20171011; DE 102010027577 A1 20120119; DE 102010027577 B4 20150430

INPADOC legal status


2018-09-28 [PG25 MT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-09-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20180712

2018-08-31 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-08-31 [PG25 PL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-08-31 [PG25 SM] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SM

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-07-31 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-07-31 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-07-31 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-07-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-05-31 [PG25 RS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180112

2018-05-31 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-05-31 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180211

2018-05-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180111

2018-05-31 [PG25 HR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-04-30 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-03-12 [REG NO T2] ENTRY OF EP PATENT INTO NATIONAL PHASE OF NORWAY

- Effective date: 20171011

2018-02-26 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2018-01-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2018-01-17 [REG NL FP] TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)

2017-11-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 936438 T

- Effective date: 20171115

2017-11-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2017-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-10-04 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

2017-10-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-05-24 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170502

2017-05-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FALTER, THOMAS

2017-05-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KLARE, MANFRED

2017-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F42B 12/20 20060101ALN20170412BHEP

2017-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F42B 12/10 20060101ALI20170412BHEP

2017-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F42B 1/02 20060101AFI20170412BHEP

2017-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F42B 12/22 20060101ALI20170412BHEP

2017-04-12 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: F42B0012100000

- IPC: F42B0001020000

2017-04-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIEHL DEFENCE GMBH & CO. KG

2017-02-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F42B 1/02 20060101AFI20170106BHEP

2017-02-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F42B 12/10 20060101ALI20170106BHEP

2017-02-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F42B 12/22 20060101ALI20170106BHEP

2017-02-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F42B 12/20 20060101ALN20170106BHEP

2015-04-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20150320

2015-04-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2014-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2014-10-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME

2014-10-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F42B 1/02 20060101AFI20140915BHEP

2014-10-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F42B 12/20 20060101ALN20140915BHEP

2014-10-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F42B 12/22 20060101ALI20140915BHEP

2014-10-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F42B 12/10 20060101ALI20140915BHEP

2014-10-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F42B 12/20 20060101ALN20140910BHEP

2014-10-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F42B 1/02 20060101AFI20140910BHEP

2014-10-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F42B 12/22 20060101ALI20140910BHEP

2014-10-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F42B 12/10 20060101ALI20140910BHEP

2014-10-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F42B 12/22 20060101ALI20140827BHEP

2014-10-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F42B 1/02 20060101AFI20140827BHEP

2014-10-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F42B 12/20 20060101ALN20140827BHEP

2014-10-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F42B 12/10 20060101ALI20140827BHEP

2014-09-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F42B 12/20 20060101ALN20140820BHEP

2014-09-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F42B 1/02 20060101AFI20140820BHEP

2014-09-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F42B 12/22 20060101ALI20140820BHEP

2014-09-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F42B 12/10 20060101ALI20140820BHEP

2012-01-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2012-01-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME