Global Patent Index - EP 2415700 A3

EP 2415700 A3 2013-09-11 - Device for aligning a flat product

Title (en)

Device for aligning a flat product

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Ausrichtung eines flächigen Produkts

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'orientation d'un produit plat

Publication

EP 2415700 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 11004987 A

Priority

CH 12742010 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2415700A2] The device has an aligning unit (14) arranged above a conveyor surface (16). The aligning unit is provided such that force transferred to an exposed surface (62) changes position of a flat product (30) with respect to the conveyor surface. The unit comprises a closed, flexible force transfer element (54) e.g. link chain, band or belt, which forms a sagging branch (52) on a side of the aligning unit, where the side is turned toward the conveyor surface. The branch comprises a section that lies on the exposed surface of the product, so that the force acts on the surface of the product. An independent claim is also included for a method for aligning a flat product that is conveyed to a conveying surface of a conveyor system in a conveying direction.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 9/10 (2006.01); B65H 5/02 (2006.01); B65H 5/16 (2006.01); B65H 9/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 9/103 (2013.01); B65H 5/021 (2013.01); B65H 5/16 (2013.01); B65H 9/163 (2013.01); B65H 2404/268 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

EP 2415700 A2 20120208; EP 2415700 A3 20130911; AU 2011204995 A1 20120223; AU 2011204995 B2 20160107; CA 2746911 A1 20120206; CA 2746911 C 20161101; CH 703561 A1 20120215; US 2012031733 A1 20120209; US 8875868 B2 20141104

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20151130

2014-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20140222

2014-04-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2013-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2013-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: BA ME

2013-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65H 9/10 20060101AFI20130805BHEP

2013-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65H 9/16 20060101ALI20130805BHEP

2013-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65H 5/02 20060101ALI20130805BHEP

2013-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65H 5/16 20060101ALI20130805BHEP

2012-03-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: AUF DER MAUR, KONRAD

2012-02-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2012-02-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: BA ME