Global Patent Index - EP 2416752 B1

EP 2416752 B1 2013-09-18 - POWDERY COMPOSITION FOR SHAPING KERATIN FIBRES AND GIVING THEM SHINE

Title (en)

POWDERY COMPOSITION FOR SHAPING KERATIN FIBRES AND GIVING THEM SHINE

Title (de)

PULVERFÖRMIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR FORM- UND GLANZGEBUNG KERATINISCHER FASERN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION PULVÉRULENTE POUR METTRE EN FORME DES FIBRES KÉRATINIQUES ET LEUR DONNER DE L'ÉCLAT

Publication

EP 2416752 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 10710576 A

Priority

  • EP 2010053700 W
  • DE 102009002267 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2012021028A1] Powdery compositions for temporarily shaping human hair containing 50 to 90 wt. % of water, 0.5 wt. % to 10 wt. % of at least one other liquid having a boiling point higher than 150° C. at a pressure of 1013 mbar, at least one starch substituted with carboxy-(C1 to C4) alkyl groups, and metal oxide particles coated on the surface with fluorine-containing organic groups. The powdery compositions, when applied to hair, provide excellent hairstyle and shine. The powdery compositions can easily be applied to hair. By mechanically manipulating hair covered with the powdery compositions, cosmetic active substances are released in a targeted manner on the areas of the hair to be shaped

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/11 (2006.01); A61K 8/02 (2006.01); A61K 8/26 (2006.01); A61K 8/29 (2006.01); A61K 8/34 (2006.01); A61K 8/70 (2006.01); A61K 8/73 (2006.01); A61Q 1/12 (2006.01); A61Q 5/00 (2006.01); A61Q 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/26 (2013.01); A61K 8/02 (2013.01); A61K 8/11 (2013.01); A61K 8/29 (2013.01); A61K 8/345 (2013.01); A61K 8/70 (2013.01); A61K 8/732 (2013.01); A61Q 1/12 (2013.01); A61Q 5/00 (2013.01); A61Q 5/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 102009002267 A1 20101014; EP 2416752 A2 20120215; EP 2416752 B1 20130918; JP 2012522818 A 20120927; JP 5680058 B2 20150304; US 2012021028 A1 20120126; WO 2010115700 A2 20101014; WO 2010115700 A3 20111229

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160322

2017-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160322

2016-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160322

2016-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 632342 T

- Effective date: 20160322

2016-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-07-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140331

2016-07-29 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130918

2016-07-29 [PG25 HU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT; INVALID AB INITIO

- Effective date: 20100322

2016-06-30 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130918

2016-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130918

2016-05-31 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130918

2016-04-29 [PG25 SM] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SM

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130918

2016-02-29 [PG25 MT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130918

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502010004782

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 6

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 6

2015-05-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150320

- Year of fee payment: 6

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 6

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 6

2015-01-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140322

2014-12-31 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2014-10-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140322

2014-10-02 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502010004782

- Effective date: 20140619

2014-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130918

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130918

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140417

- Year of fee payment: 5

2014-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20140619

2014-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140120

2014-06-19 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502010004782

2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130918

2014-05-30 [PG25 PL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130918

2014-04-30 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130918

2014-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130918

2014-04-30 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130918

2014-04-30 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130918

2014-04-30 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140118

2014-03-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130918

2014-02-28 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130918

2014-02-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130918

2014-02-28 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130918

2014-02-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20131219

2014-02-25 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2014-02-12 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20130918

2014-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130918

2014-01-31 [PG25 NO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20131218

2014-01-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130807

2014-01-31 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130918

2014-01-31 [PG25 HR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130918

2013-11-14 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502010004782

- Effective date: 20131114

2013-10-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 632342 T

- Effective date: 20131015

2013-10-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2013-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2013-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR

2013-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2013-05-29 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20130430

2012-12-05 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2012-02-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 8/11 20060101AFI20120120BHEP

2012-02-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 8/26 20060101ALI20120120BHEP

2012-02-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 8/29 20060101ALI20120120BHEP

2012-02-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 8/34 20060101ALI20120120BHEP

2012-02-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 8/73 20060101ALI20120120BHEP

2012-02-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61Q 1/12 20060101ALI20120120BHEP

2012-02-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61Q 5/00 20060101ALI20120120BHEP

2012-02-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61Q 5/06 20060101ALI20120120BHEP

2012-02-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 8/02 20060101ALI20120120BHEP

2012-02-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 8/70 20060101ALI20120120BHEP

2012-02-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20110921

2012-02-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR