Global Patent Index - EP 2432058 B8

EP 2432058 B8 2013-09-11 - NANOWIRE-BASED MEMBRANE ELECTRODE ASSEMBLIES FOR FUEL CELLS

Title (en)

NANOWIRE-BASED MEMBRANE ELECTRODE ASSEMBLIES FOR FUEL CELLS

Title (de)

AUF NANODRÄHTEN BASIERENDE MEMBRANELEKTRODENBAUGRUPPEN FÜR BRENNSTOFFZELLEN

Title (fr)

ELECTRODE MEMBRANE A BASE DE NANOFILS POUR PILES A COMBUSTIBLE

Publication

EP 2432058 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 11193293 A

Priority

  • EP 05853082 A
  • US 63447204 P
  • US 73810005 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2006062947A2] The present invention disclosed nanowires for use in a fuel cell comprising a metal catalyst deposited on a surface of the nanowires. A membrane electrode assembly for a fuel cell is disclosed which generally comprises a proton exchange membrane, an anode electrode, and a cathode electrode, wherein at least one or more of the anode electrode and cathode electrode comprise an interconnected network of the catalyst supported nanowires. Methods are also disclosed for preparing a membrane electrode assembly and fuel cell based upon an interconnected network of nanowires.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01M 4/86 (2006.01); B82Y 30/00 (2011.01); H01M 4/88 (2006.01); H01M 4/90 (2006.01); H01M 4/92 (2006.01); H01M 8/02 (2006.01); H01M 8/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01M 4/8605 (2013.01); H01M 4/8846 (2013.01); H01M 4/8853 (2013.01); H01M 4/8867 (2013.01); H01M 4/90 (2013.01); H01M 4/9075 (2013.01); H01M 4/921 (2013.01); H01M 4/925 (2013.01); H01M 4/926 (2013.01); H01M 8/023 (2013.01); H01M 8/1004 (2013.01); H01M 8/1007 (2013.01); H01M 8/1011 (2013.01); H01M 8/1086 (2013.01); B82Y 30/00 (2013.01); H01M 4/881 (2013.01); H01M 8/0232 (2013.01); H01M 8/0234 (2013.01); H01M 8/0236 (2013.01); H01M 8/0241 (2013.01); Y02E 60/523 (2013.01); Y02P 70/56 (2015.11); Y10S 977/762 (2013.01); Y10S 977/948 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 2006062947 A2 20060615; WO 2006062947 A3 20061221; AU 2005314211 A1 20060615; AU 2005314211 B2 20100708; CA 2588548 A1 20060615; CN 101107737 A 20080116; CN 101107737 B 20120321; CN 101707256 A 20100512; CN 101707256 B 20131106; CN 102593466 A 20120718; EP 1829141 A2 20070905; EP 1829141 A4 20090722; EP 1829141 B1 20130529; EP 2432058 A1 20120321; EP 2432058 B1 20130717; EP 2432058 B8 20130911; JP 2008523565 A 20080703; JP 5277451 B2 20130828; KR 101405353 B1 20140611; KR 20070086981 A 20070827; US 2006188774 A1 20060824; US 2009017363 A1 20090115; US 2010233585 A1 20100916; US 2011229795 A1 20110922; US 2012282540 A1 20121108; US 7179561 B2 20070220; US 7977007 B2 20110712; US 7977013 B2 20110712; US 8357475 B2 20130122; US 8440369 B2 20130514

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171128

- Year of fee payment: 13

2014-07-31 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602005040506

- Effective date: 20140422

2014-07-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ONED MATERIAL LLC, PALO ALTO, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: NANOSYS, INC., MILPITAS, CALIF., US

- Document: DE 602005040506

- Effective date: 20140617

2014-07-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ONED MATERIAL LLC, PALO ALTO, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: PRVP HOLDINGS, LLC, WEST PALM BEACH, FLA., US

- Document: DE 602005040506

- Effective date: 20130812

2014-07-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602005040506

- Representative's name: LEINWEBER & ZIMMERMANN, DE

- Effective date: 20140617

2014-06-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20140422

2014-06-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602005040506

- Representative's name: LEINWEBER & ZIMMERMANN, DE

2014-06-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140515 AND 20140521

2013-09-12 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602005040506

- Effective date: 20130912

2013-08-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: NANOSYS, INC.

2013-07-17 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1829141 P

2013-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2013-07-17 [D11X] LEGAL MEANS OF EXECUTION (DELETED)

2013-07-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2013-07-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2013-06-19 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

- Effective date: 20130502

2013-06-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PRVP HOLDINGS, LLC

2012-11-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01M 8/10 20060101ALI20121023BHEP

2012-11-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01M 4/86 20060101AFI20121023BHEP

2012-11-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01M 4/92 20060101ALI20121023BHEP

2012-11-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01M 8/02 20060101ALI20121023BHEP

2012-11-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01M 4/90 20060101ALI20121023BHEP

2012-11-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01M 4/88 20060101ALI20121023BHEP

2012-11-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B82Y 30/00 20110101ALI20121023BHEP

2012-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20120911

2012-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOCK, LAWRENCE A.

2012-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PARCE, J. WALLACE

2012-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHOW, CALVIN Y. H.

2012-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NIU, CHUNMING

2012-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: EMPEDOCLES, STEPHEN A.

2012-03-21 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1829141 P

2012-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR