Global Patent Index - EP 2436631 A9

EP 2436631 A9 2013-09-25 - METHOD FOR ADHERING DOUBLE-SIDED ADHESIVE TAPE AND DEVICE FOR ADHERING DOUBLE-SIDED ADHESIVE TAPE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR ADHERING DOUBLE-SIDED ADHESIVE TAPE AND DEVICE FOR ADHERING DOUBLE-SIDED ADHESIVE TAPE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ANHAFTUNG EINES DOPPELSEITIGEN KLEBEBANDES SOWIE VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANHAFTUNG EINES DOPPELSEITIGEN KLEBEBANDES

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE COLLAGE DE RUBAN ADHÉSIF DOUBLE-FACE ET DISPOSITIF DE COLLAGE DE CE RUBAN ADHÉSIF DOUBLE-FACE

Publication

EP 2436631 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 10769467 A

Priority

  • JP 2010002843 W
  • JP 2009111962 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2436631A1] A double-faced adhesive tape is accurately joined to a bent tape joining face of a workpiece while a separator on an upper surface remains without separation of the separator. Specifically, the double-faced adhesive tape has the separator on the upper surface remaining and a separator on a lower surface being separated, and a rotary cutter forms slits at given intervals along sides of the separator on the double-faced adhesive tape that is to be supplied to a tape joining position. Then, the double-faced adhesive tape having the separator with the slits formed therein is guided to the tape joining position at a front end of apparatus, and is successively joined to a front face of the workpiece while being pressed with a joining roller.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 35/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 37/002 (2013.01); B65H 35/0013 (2013.01); B65H 35/0033 (2013.01); B65H 37/005 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1052 (2013.01); Y10T 156/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 2436631 A1 20120404; EP 2436631 A4 20131009; EP 2436631 A8 20131113; EP 2436631 A9 20130925; CN 102414104 A 20120411; JP 2010260674 A 20101118; JP 5210239 B2 20130612; US 2012279645 A1 20121108; WO 2010125765 A1 20101104

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150206

2014-10-22 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20140925

2014-08-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65H 37/00 20060101ALI20140711BHEP

2014-08-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65H 35/00 20060101AFI20140711BHEP

2013-10-09 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20130906

2013-10-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65H 37/00 20060101ALI20130902BHEP

2013-10-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B65H 35/00 20060101AFI20130902BHEP

2012-08-15 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2012-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20120213

2012-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR