Global Patent Index - EP 2436858 B1

EP 2436858 B1 20190417 - Locking cylinder for a lock

Title (en)

Locking cylinder for a lock

Title (de)

Schließzylinder für ein Schloss

Title (fr)

Cylindre de fermeture pour un verrou

Publication

EP 2436858 B1 20190417 (DE)

Application

EP 11007989 A 20110930

Priority

DE 202010013859 U 20101001

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2436858A2] The lock cylinder (10) has shaft (14) that is rotatably mounted in a longitudinal bore (12) of housing (54). A rotational axis (16) is rotatable with respect to housing through shaft. The torque-proof coupling between shaft and locking lug (18) is enabled based on verification of authority code. A clutch (22) is connected with shaft. A slider (24) is connected with drive element (20) by spring element (26). The clutch is engaged into the locking lug in coupled state if slider is actuated by drive element.

IPC 8 full level

E05B 47/06 (2006.01); E05B 9/04 (2006.01); E05B 17/04 (2006.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP)

E05B 9/041 (2013.01); E05B 17/047 (2013.01); E05B 47/0615 (2013.01); E05B 47/0642 (2013.01); E05B 47/0012 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0023 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0031 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

None

Citation (opposition)

Opponent : Uhlmann & Zacher GmbH

  • DE 10235201 A1 20040219 - UHLMANN GUENTER [DE]
  • DE 19854454 A1 20000608 - KLENK ULF [DE], et al
  • DE 102006001266 B3 20070503 - SECCOR HIGH SECURITY GMBH [DE]
  • EP 1953314 A1 20080806 - UHLMANN GUENTER [DE], et al
  • DE 102008001693 B3 20091210 - UHLMANN & ZACHER GMBH [DE]
  • EP 0413964 A1 19910227 - GRETSCH UNITAS GMBH [DE]
  • DE 10225490 A1 20031009 - BURG WAECHTER KG [DE]
  • DE 102006020614 A1 20061102 - SANCAK MEHMET [DE]
  • DE 19831846 A1 20000120 - WINKHAUS FA AUGUST [DE]
  • WO 2011022855 A1 20110303 - KABA AG [CH], et al
  • DE 102004056988 A1 20060601 - KEYOWA GMBH [DE]
  • ANONYMOUS: "Systembeschreibung Clex Prime", UHLMANN & ZACHER - KATALOG, 5 May 2004 (2004-05-05), pages 1 - 30, XP055674082
  • ANONYMOUS: "Clex Prime CX6122 / CX6123", UHLMANN & ZACHER - GEBRAUCHSANWEISUNG, 14 March 2007 (2007-03-14), pages 1 - 4, XP055674074
  • HERBERT WITTEL ET AL.: "ROLOFF / MATEK MASCHINENELEMENTE", vol. 19, 2009, VIEWEG + TEUBNER
  • BEITZ W. ET AL: "DUBBEL. Taschenbuch für Maschinenbau", 2001, SPRINGER, article "Federnde Verbindungen", pages: 50 - 59, 78-79, XP055674056
  • ANONYMOUS: "Passchreiben", WIKIPEDIA, 15 April 2010 (2010-04-15), XP055674053, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://de.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Passscheib e&oldid=73168891>
  • MEYERS: "Meyers Lexikon der Technik und der exakten Naturwis- senschaften", 1970, BIBLIOGRAPHISCHES INSTITUT AG, article "Passchreiben", pages: 1910, XP055674051
  • ANONYMOUS: "Feder (Technik)", WIKIPEDIA, 26 September 2010 (2010-09-26), XP055674044, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:https://de.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Feder_(Technik)&oldid=79580908>

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

DOCDB simple family (publication)

DE 202011106208 U1 20120112; EP 2436858 A2 20120404; EP 2436858 A3 20160302; EP 2436858 B1 20190417

DOCDB simple family (application)

DE 202011106208 U 20110930; EP 11007989 A 20110930