EP 2443733 A1 20120425 - CONVERTER CONTROL
Title (en)
CONVERTER CONTROL
Title (de)
UMRICHTERSTEUERUNG
Title (fr)
COMMANDE DE CONVERTISSEUR
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 2009057381 W 20090615
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2010145688A1] A multilevel voltage source converter (11) for high voltage DC power transmission and reactive power compensation comprises at least one module (40) including at least one switch (12) and an electronic bypass system. The electronic bypass system is controllable to activate the at least one switch (12) in the module (40) to cause a short circuit through the activated switch (12) and thereby maintain a converter current (36) through the module (40) and the multilevel voltage source converter (11).
IPC 8 full level
H02M 7/483 (2007.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
H02M 1/32 (2013.01 - EP); H02M 7/483 (2013.01 - EP US); H02M 7/4835 (2021.05 - EP US); H02M 1/0006 (2021.05 - EP)
Citation (search report)
See references of WO 2010145688A1
Citation (examination)
- JP S59198869 A 19841110 - FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD
- US 2008232145 A1 20080925 - HILLER MARC [DE], et al
- GUANJUN DING ET AL: "New technologies of voltage source converter (VSC) for HVDC transmission system based on VSC", POWER AND ENERGY SOCIETY GENERAL MEETING - CONVERSION AND DELIVERY OF ELECTRICAL ENERGY IN THE 21ST CENTURY, 2008 IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, 20 July 2008 (2008-07-20), pages 1 - 8, XP031304187, ISBN: 978-1-4244-1905-0
- MARQUARDT ET AL: "New Concept for High Voltage - Modular Multilevel Converter", POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE, 2004. PESC 04. 2004 IEEE 35TH ANNUAL, AACHEN, GERMANY 20-25 JUNE 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, 1 January 2004 (2004-01-01), XP002447362, ISBN: 978-0-7803-8399-9
- LESNICAR ET AL: "A new modular voltage source inverter topology", 20030101; 20030000, 1 January 2003 (2003-01-01), XP002447361
Citation (third parties)
Third party :
- US 6496391 B1 20021217 - IKEDA IKUO [JP], et al
- JP H0658960 A 19940304 - CENTRAL RES INST ELECT
- International Standard IEC 60110-1, first edition, 1998-06
- British Standard BS EN 60831-1:1998/IEC 60831-1:1996
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 2009057381 W 20090615; EP 09779756 A 20090615