EP 2467507 B1 20190227 - BRASS ALLOY
Title (en)
BRASS ALLOY
Title (de)
MESSINGLEGIERUNG
Title (fr)
ALLIAGE DE LAITON
Publication
Application
Priority
- DE 102009038657 A 20090818
- DE 2010000976 W 20100817
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2011020468A1] The invention relates to a brass alloy substantially consisting of copper and zinc. The alloy has at least one additional alloy component. A lead content is at most 0.1 weight percent. The zinc fraction is 40.5 to 46 weight percent. The alloy comprises a mixed crystal having fractions of an alpha microstructure and of a beta microstructure. The weight proportion of the beta microstructure is at least 30% and at most 70%.
IPC 8 full level
C22C 29/04 (2006.01); C22F 1/08 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
C22F 1/08 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (examination)
SPIEKERMANN P: "Legierungen - ein besonderes patentrechtliches Problem?", MITTEILUNGEN DER DEUTSCHEN PATENTANWAELTE, HEYMANN, KOLN, DE, vol. 34, 1 January 1993 (1993-01-01), pages 178 - 190, XP002152326, ISSN: 0026-6884
Citation (opposition)
Opponent : Wieland-Werke AG
- JP H07166279 A 19950627 - KOBE STEEL LTD
- KR 20060096877 A 20060913 - POONGSAN CORP [KR]
- KR 100252378 B1 20000415 - DAECHANG IND CO LTD [KR]
- DE 10308779 B3 20041104 - WIELAND WERKE AG [DE]
- DE 102007029991 A1 20090102 - WIELAND WERKE AG [DE]
- CA 2662814 A1 20090707 - XIAMEN LOTA INT CO LTD [CN]
- JP S5629643 A 19810325 - FURUKAWA METALS CO
- DE 112004002639 T5 20061123 - NINGBO POWERWAY GROUP CO [CN]
- "Kupfer und Kupferlegierungen in der Technik", 1967, article KURT DIES: "6.5 Kupfer-Zink", pages: 254 - 261, 273-275,333-337,350,373-374, XP055661342
- D.W. DAVIS: "A Note on the Dezincification of Brass and the Inhibiting Effect of Elemental Additions", July 1993 (1993-07-01), pages 1 - 9, XP009161008
- ERGEBNISSE VON UNTERSUCHUNGEN AN LEGIERUNG GEMÄSS D5, 18 January 2000 (2000-01-18)
- ERGEBNISSE VON UNTERSUCHUNGEN AN LEGIERUNG GEMÄSS D9
Opponent : lebronze alloys Germany GmbH
- DE 69720261 T2 20031127 - TOTO LTD [JP]
- GB 1393622 A 19750507 - INT NICKEL LTD
- GB 1285561 A 19720816 - IMP METAL IND KYNOCH LTD
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DE 102009038657 A1 20110224; DE 112010003316 A5 20120628; EP 2467507 A1 20120627; EP 2467507 B1 20190227; ES 2724152 T3 20190906; HU E043477 T2 20190828; PL 2467507 T3 20190830; PT 2467507 T 20190513; TR 201906400 T4 20190521; US 2012207642 A1 20120816; WO 2011020468 A1 20110224
DOCDB simple family (application)
DE 102009038657 A 20090818; DE 112010003316 T 20100817; DE 2010000976 W 20100817; EP 10768172 A 20100817; ES 10768172 T 20100817; HU E10768172 A 20100817; PL 10768172 T 20100817; PT 10768172 T 20100817; TR 201906400 T 20100817; US 201013391195 A 20100817