Global Patent Index - EP 2475746 A4

EP 2475746 A4 2013-09-25 - FUEL PRODUCTION FROM FEEDSTOCK CONTAINING LIPIDIC MATERIAL

Title (en)

FUEL PRODUCTION FROM FEEDSTOCK CONTAINING LIPIDIC MATERIAL

Title (de)

BRENNSTOFFHERSTELLUNG AUS EINEM ROHMATERIAL MIT EINEM LIPIDMATERIAL

Title (fr)

PRODUCTION DE CARBURANT À PARTIR DE MATIÈRE PREMIÈRE CONTENANT UN MATÉRIAU LIPIDIQUE

Publication

EP 2475746 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 10815940 A

Priority

  • US 27609909 P
  • US 2010047777 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2011056869A1] This invention relates to the production of dewaxed and/or hydroisomerized fuel composition that includes a step of hydrotreating a feedstock containing the lipidic material. The fuel compositions are high quality fuel compositions in which the fuel can be ultimately tailored for a variety of end uses such as jet fuel or diesel fuel.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10G 3/00 (2006.01); C10G 49/00 (2006.01); C10G 69/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/026 (2013.01); C10G 3/45 (2013.01); C10G 3/46 (2013.01); C10G 3/48 (2013.01); C10G 3/50 (2013.01); C10G 45/58 (2013.01); C10G 65/043 (2013.01); C10G 65/12 (2013.01); C10G 2300/1014 (2013.01); C10G 2300/1018 (2013.01); C10G 2300/301 (2013.01); C10G 2400/04 (2013.01); C10G 2400/08 (2013.01); Y02P 30/20 (2015.11)

Citation (search report)

  • [XYI] US 2009019763 A1 20090122 - GHONASGI DHANANJAY B [US], et al
  • [XYI] CA 2685884 A1 20090122 - CONOCOPHILLIPS CO [US]
  • [XYI] JENNIFER HOLMGREN: "BIO AVIATION FUELS", 14 March 2008 (2008-03-14), BRUSSELS, pages 1 - 13, XP002711192, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.ascension-publishing.com/BIZ/HD48.pdf>
  • [Y] QUIANG HU ET AL.: "MICROALGAL TRIACYLGLYCEROLS AS FEEDSTOCKS FOR BIOFUEL PRODUCTION: PERSPECTIVES AND ADVANCES", THE PLANT JOURNAL, vol. 54, 31 December 2008 (2008-12-31), pages 621 - 639, XP002711196
  • [Y] NATIONAL RENEWABLE ENERGY LABORATORY: "FROM BIOMASS TO BIOFUELS; NREL LEADS THE WAY", 31 August 2006 (2006-08-31), pages 1 - 6, XP002711197, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.nrel.gov/biomass/pdfs/39436.pdf>

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

US 2011056869 A1 20110310; AU 2010292468 A1 20120419; CA 2773368 A1 20110317; CN 102625822 A 20120801; EP 2475746 A2 20120718; EP 2475746 A4 20130925; JP 2013503946 A 20130204; SG 10201404952V A 20141030; SG 178893 A1 20120427; WO 2011031630 A2 20110317; WO 2011031630 A3 20110630

INPADOC legal status


2017-09-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20170404

2017-02-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20170124

2013-09-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20130826

2013-09-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10G 69/10 20060101ALI20130814BHEP

2013-09-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10G 49/00 20060101ALI20130814BHEP

2013-09-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10G 3/00 20060101AFI20130814BHEP

2012-12-12 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2012-08-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HILBERT, TIMOTHY, L.

2012-08-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NOVAK, WILLIAM, J.

2012-08-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HANKS, PATRICK, L.

2012-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20120314

2012-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR