EP 2487240 A1 20120815 - Micrornas differentially expressed in pancreatic diseases and uses thereof
Title (en)
Micrornas differentially expressed in pancreatic diseases and uses thereof
Title (de)
Mikro-RNA, die differentiell in Pankreaserkrankungen exprimiert sind, und ihre Verwendung
Title (fr)
Micro ARN différemment exprimés dans des maladies pancréatiques et leurs utilisations
Publication
Application
Priority
- EP 07842816 A 20070919
- US 82617306 P 20060919
Abstract (en)
The present invention concerns methods and compositions for identifying a miRNA profile for a particular condition, such as pancreatic disease, and using the profile in assessing the condition of a patient.
IPC 8 full level
A61K 35/12 (2015.01); A61K 35/14 (2015.01); A61K 35/16 (2015.01); A61K 35/39 (2015.01); A61K 35/56 (2015.01); A61K 35/66 (2015.01); A61K 35/76 (2015.01); C12N 15/113 (2010.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
A61K 48/00 (2013.01 - US); A61P 1/18 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 29/00 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 35/00 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 35/02 (2018.01 - EP); C12N 15/113 (2013.01 - EP US); C12Q 1/686 (2013.01 - US); C12Q 1/6886 (2013.01 - EP US); C12N 2310/14 (2013.01 - EP US); C12N 2330/10 (2013.01 - EP US); C12Q 2600/158 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (applicant)
- US 14170705 A 20050531
- US 5681947 A 19971028 - BERGSTROM DONALD EUGENE [US], et al
- US 5652099 A 19970729 - CONRAD MICHAEL J [US]
- US 5763167 A 19980609 - CONRAD MICHAEL J [US]
- US 5614617 A 19970325 - COOK PHILIP DAN [US], et al
- US 5670663 A 19970923 - DURZAN DON J [US], et al
- US 5872232 A 19990216 - COOK PHILLIP DAN [US], et al
- US 5859221 A 19990112 - COOK PHILLIP DAN [US], et al
- US 5446137 A 19950829 - MAAG HANS [US], et al
- US 5886165 A 19990323 - KANDIMALLA EKAMBAR R [US], et al
- US 5714606 A 19980203 - ACEVEDO OSCAR L [US], et al
- US 5672697 A 19970930 - BUHR CHRIS [US], et al
- US 5466786 A 19951114 - BUHR CHRIS A [US], et al
- US 5792847 A 19980811 - BUHR CHRIS A [US], et al
- US 5223618 A 19930629 - COOK PHILLIP DAN [US], et al
- US 5470967 A 19951128 - HUIE EDWARD M [US], et al
- US 5378825 A 19950103 - COOK PHILLIP DAN [US], et al
- US 5777092 A 19980707 - COOK PHILLIP DAN [US], et al
- US 5623070 A 19970422 - COOK PHILLIP DAN [US], et al
- US 5610289 A 19970311 - COOK PHILLIP DAN [US], et al
- US 5602240 A 19970211 - MESMAEKER ALAIN DE [CH], et al
- US 5858988 A 19990112 - WANG JUI H [US]
- US 5214136 A 19930525 - LIN KUEI-YING [US], et al
- US 5700922 A 19971223 - COOK PHILLIP DAN [US]
- US 5708154 A 19980113 - SMITH STEVEN S [US], et al
- US 5728525 A 19980317 - CONRAD MICHAEL J [US]
- US 5637683 A 19970610 - USHER DAVID A [US], et al
- US 6251666 B1 20010626 - BEIGELMAN LEONID [US]
- US 5480980 A 19960102 - SEELA FRANK [DE]
- US 4404289 A 19830913 - MASUDA NOBUHITO [JP], et al
- US 4405711 A 19830920 - MASUDA NOBUHITO [JP], et al
- US 4337063 A 19820629 - MIHARA YUJI, et al
- US 5268486 A 19931207 - WAGGONER ALAN S [US], et al
- GB 1529202 A 19781018 - CIBA GEIGY AG
- US 66712603 A 20030919
- US 4704362 A 19871103 - ITAKURA KEIICHI [US], et al
- US 5221619 A 19930622 - ITAKURA KEIICHI [US], et al
- US 5583013 A 19961210 - ITAKURA KEIICHI [US], et al
- EP 0266032 A1 19880504 - BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]
- US 5705629 A 19980106 - BHONGLE NANDKUMAR [US]
- US 4659774 A 19870421 - WEBB THOMAS R [US], et al
- US 4816571 A 19890328 - ANDRUS WILLIAM A [US], et al
- US 5141813 A 19920825 - NELSON PAUL S [US]
- US 5264566 A 19931123 - FROEHLER BRIAN C [US], et al
- US 4959463 A 19900925 - FROEHLER BRIAN C [US], et al
- US 5428148 A 19950627 - REDDY PARAMESWARA M [US], et al
- US 5554744 A 19960910 - BHONGLE NANDKUMAR [US], et al
- US 5574146 A 19961112 - REDDY M PARAMESWARA [US], et al
- US 5602244 A 19970211 - CARUTHERS MARVIN H [US], et al
- US 4683202 A 19870728 - MULLIS KARY B [US]
- US 4682195 A 19870721 - YILMAZ HAMZA [US]
- US 5645897 A 19970708 - ANDRA JURGEN [DE]
- US 6723509 B2 20040420 - ACH ROBERT A [US]
- US 5143854 A 19920901 - PIRRUNG MICHAEL C [US], et al
- US 5202231 A 19930413 - DRMANAC RADOJE T [US], et al
- US 5242974 A 19930907 - HOLMES CHRISTOPHER P [US]
- US 5288644 A 19940222 - BEAVIS RONALD C [US], et al
- US 5324633 A 19940628 - FODOR STEPHEN P A [US], et al
- US 5384261 A 19950124 - WINKLER JAMES L [US], et al
- US 5405783 A 19950411 - PIRRUNG MICHAEL C [US], et al
- US 5412087 A 19950502 - MCGALL GLENN H [US], et al
- US 5424186 A 19950613 - FODOR STEPHEN P A [US], et al
- US 5429807 A 19950704 - MATSON ROBERT S [US], et al
- US 5432049 A 19950711 - FISCHER EVELYN [DE], et al
- US 5436327 A 19950725 - SOUTHERN EDWIN M [GB], et al
- US 5445934 A 19950829 - FODOR STEPHEN P A [US], et al
- US 5468613 A 19951121 - ERLICH HENRY A [US], et al
- US 5470710 A 19951128 - WEISS ROBERT B [US], et al
- US 5472672 A 19951205 - BRENNAN THOMAS M [US]
- US 5492806 A 19960220 - DRMANAC RADOJE T [YU], et al
- US 5525464 A 19960611 - DRMANAC RADOJE T [YU], et al
- US 5503980 A 19960402 - CANTOR CHARLES R [US]
- US 5510270 A 19960423 - FODOR STEPHEN P A [US], et al
- US 5527681 A 19960618 - HOLMES CHRISTOPHER P [US]
- US 5529756 A 19960625 - BRENNAN THOMAS M [US]
- US 5532128 A 19960702 - EGGERS MITCHELL D [US], et al
- US 5545531 A 19960813 - RAVA RICHARD P [US], et al
- US 5547839 A 19960820 - DOWER WILLIAM J [US], et al
- US 5554501 A 19960910 - COASSIN PETER J [US], et al
- US 5556752 A 19960917 - LOCKHART DAVID J [US], et al
- US 5561071 A 19961001 - HOLLENBERG CORNELIS P [DE], et al
- US 5571639 A 19961105 - HUBBELL EARL A [US], et al
- US 5580726 A 19961203 - VILLEPONTEAU BRYANT [US], et al
- US 5580732 A 19961203 - GROSSMAN PAUL D [US], et al
- US 5593839 A 19970114 - HUBBELL EARL A [US], et al
- US 5599695 A 19970204 - PEASE R FABIAN [US], et al
- US 5599672 A 19970204 - LIANG PENG [US], et al
- US 5610287 A 19970311 - NIKIFOROV THEO [US], et al
- US 5624711 A 19970429 - SUNDBERG STEVEN A [US], et al
- US 5631134 A 19970520 - CANTOR CHARLES R [US]
- US 5639603 A 19970617 - SUGARMAN JEFFREY H [US], et al
- US 5654413 A 19970805 - BRENNER SYDNEY [GB]
- US 5658734 A 19970819 - BROCK PHILLIP JOE [US], et al
- US 5661028 A 19970826 - FOOTE ROBERT S [US]
- US 5665547 A 19970909 - PARDEE ARTHUR B [US], et al
- US 5667972 A 19970916 - DRMANAC RADOJE T [YU], et al
- US 5695940 A 19971209 - DRMANAC RADOJE T [YU], et al
- US 5700637 A 19971223 - SOUTHERN EDWIN [GB]
- US 5744305 A 19980428 - FODOR STEPHEN P A [US], et al
- US 5800992 A 19980901 - FODOR STEPHEN P A [US], et al
- US 5807522 A 19980915 - BROWN PATRICK O [US], et al
- US 5830645 A 19981103 - PINKEL DANIEL [US], et al
- US 5837196 A 19981117 - PINKEL DANIEL [US], et al
- US 5871928 A 19990216 - FODOR STEPHEN P A [US], et al
- US 5847219 A
- US 5876932 A 19990302 - FISCHER ACHIM [DE]
- US 5919626 A 19990706 - SHI JUFANG [US], et al
- US 6004755 A 19991221 - WANG BRUCE [US]
- US 6087102 A 20000711 - CHENCHIK ALEX [US], et al
- US 6368799 B1 20020409 - CHEE MARK [US]
- US 6383749 B2 20020507 - BOCHKARIOV DMITRY E [US], et al
- US 6617112 B2 20030909 - BEALS THOMAS P [US]
- US 6638717 B2 20031028 - PERRIN STEVEN [US], et al
- US 6720138 B2 20040413 - SHARMA PRAVEEN [NO], et al
- WO 9317126 A1 19930902 - NEW YORK HEALTH RES INST [US]
- WO 9511995 A1 19950504 - AFFYMAX TECH NV [NL], et al
- WO 9521265 A1 19950810 - ISIS INNOVATION [GB], et al
- WO 9521944 A1 19950817 - SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al
- WO 9535505 A1 19951228 - UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]
- WO 9631622 A1 19961010 - ISIS INNOVATION [GB], et al
- WO 9710365 A1 19970320 - AFFYMAX TECH NV [NL], et al
- WO 9727317 A1 19970731 - AFFYMETRIX INC [US], et al
- WO 9935505 A2 19990715 - INTEL CORP [US], et al
- WO 9923256 A1 19990514 - COLD SPRING HARBOR LAB [US], et al
- WO 9936760 A1 19990722 - GENETIC MICROSYSTEMS INC [US], et al
- WO 0138580 A2 20010531 - CURAGEN CORP [US], et al
- WO 0168255 A2 20010920 - PACKARD BIOSCIENCE CORP [US]
- WO 03020898 A2 20030313 - SPECTRAL GENOMICS INC [US], et al
- WO 03040410 A1 20030515 - NIMBLEGEN SYSTEMS INC [US]
- WO 03053586 A1 20030703 - AFFYMETRIX INC [US], et al
- WO 03087297 A2 20031023 - UNIV NORTH CAROLINA STATE [US], et al
- WO 03091426 A1 20031106 - SPECTRAL GENOMICS INC [US], et al
- WO 03100012 A2 20031204 - NIMBLEGEN SYSTEMS INC [US]
- WO 2004020085 A1 20040311 - SURMODICS INC [US]
- WO 2004027093 A1 20040401 - CHANCELLOR MASTER AND SCHOLARS [GB], et al
- EP 0373203 A1 19900620 - ISIS INNOVATION [GB]
- EP 0785280 A2 19970723 - AFFYMETRIX INC [US]
- EP 0799897 A1 19971008 - AFFYMETRIX INC [US]
- GB 8803000 A 19880210
- WO 9743450 A1 19971120 - AFFYMETRIX INC [US], et al
- WO 03023058 A2 20030320 - MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al
- WO 03022421 A2 20030320 - CORNING INC [US]
- WO 03029485 A2 20030410 - AZIGN BIOSCIENCE AS [DK], et al
- WO 03067217 A2 20030814 - INTEGRIDERM INC [US], et al
- WO 03066906 A2 20030814 - EASTERN VIRGINIA MED SCHOOL [US]
- WO 03076928 A1 20030918 - UNIV UTAH RES FOUND [US], et al
- WO 03093810 A1 20031113 - VIALOGY CORP [US], et al
- WO 03100448 A1 20031204 - COMPUSIGN PTY LTD [AU], et al
- US 5677195 A 19971014 - WINKLER JAMES L [US], et al
- US 6040193 A 20000321 - WINKLER JAMES L [US], et al
- US 5770358 A 19980623 - DOWER WILLIAM J [US], et al
- US 5789162 A 19980804 - DOWER WILLIAM J [US], et al
- US 5708153 A 19980113 - DOWER WILLIAM J [US], et al
- US 5856174 A 19990105 - LIPSHUTZ ROBERT J [US], et al
- US 5922591 A 19990713 - ANDERSON ROLFE C [US], et al
- US 54520700 A 20000407
- US 5202231 A 19930413 - DRMANAC RADOJE T [US], et al
- US 6368799 B1 20020409 - CHEE MARK [US]
- US 6383749 B2 20020507 - BOCHKARIOV DMITRY E [US], et al
- US 6617112 B2 20030909 - BEALS THOMAS P [US]
- US 6638717 B2 20031028 - PERRIN STEVEN [US], et al
- US 6720138 B2 20040413 - SHARMA PRAVEEN [NO], et al
- US 27364005 A 20051114
- AMBROS, CELL, vol. 107, no. 7, 2001, pages 823 - 826
- ANDRIANIFAHANANA ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., vol. 7, no. 12, 2001, pages 4033 - 4040
- BALAGUE ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, vol. 109, no. 3, 1995, pages 953 - 964
- BEAUCAGE; AND, TETRAHEDRON, vol. 48, 1992, pages 2223 - 2311
- BHANOT ET AL., AM. J SURG. PATHOL., vol. 30, no. 6, 2006, pages 754 - 759
- BRENNECKE ET AL., CELL, vol. 113, 2003, pages 25 - 36
- CALIN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, vol. 99, 2002, pages 15524 - 15529
- CARRINGTON ET AL., SCIENCE, vol. 301, no. 5631, 2003, pages 336 - 338
- CHEN ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, vol. 120, no. 7, 2007, pages 1511 - 1517
- CUMMINS ET AL., IRT: NUCLEOSIDES AND NUCLEOSIDES, LA JOLLA CA, 1996, pages 72
- DENLI ET AL., TRENDS BIOCHEM. SCI., vol. 28, 2003, pages 196
- DIDENKO, BIOTECHNIQUES, vol. 31, no. 5, 2001, pages 1106 - 16
- DUXBURY ET AL., BR. J CANCER, vol. 91, no. 7, 2004, pages 1384 - 1390
- EMPTAGE ET AL., NEURON, vol. 29, no. 1, January 2001 (2001-01-01), pages 197 - 208
- ESQUELA-KERSCHER; SLACK, NAT REV CANCER, vol. 6, no. 4, 2006, pages 259 - 269
- FODOR ET AL., SCIENCE, vol. 251, 1991, pages 767 - 777
- FREELOVE; WALLING, AM. FAM. PHYSICIAN, vol. 73, no. 3, 2006, pages 485 - 492
- FRIESS ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, vol. 113, no. 3, 1997, pages 904 - 913
- FROEHLER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., vol. 14, no. 13, 1986, pages 5399 - 5407
- GILLAM ET AL., J BIOL. CHEM., vol. 253, 1978, pages 2532
- GILLAM ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., vol. 6, 1979, pages 2973
- GRIFFEY ET AL., JMASS SPECTROM, vol. 32, no. 3, 1997, pages 305 - 13
- GRIFFITHS-JONES ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., vol. 34, 2006, pages D140 - D144
- HE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, vol. 102, no. 52, 2005, pages 19075 - 19080
- HOLLINGSWORTH ET AL., INT. J CANCER, vol. 57, no. 2, 1994, pages 198 - 203
- HUBER ET AL., BIOINFORMATICS, vol. 18, no. 1, 2002, pages 96 - 104
- ITAKURA; RIGGS, SCIENCE, vol. 209, 1980, pages 1401 - 1405
- ITAKURA ET AL., J BIOL. CHEM., vol. 250, 1975, pages 4592
- JEMAL ET AL., CA CANCER JCLIN., vol. 56, no. 2, 2006, pages 106 - 130
- JHALA ET AL., AM. J CLIN. PATHOL., vol. 126, no. 4, 2006, pages 572 - 579
- KHORANA, SCIENCE, vol. 203, 1979, pages 614
- KLEEFF ET AL., ONCOGENE, 1999, pages 5363 - 5372
- KLOSTERMEIER; MILLAR, BIOPOLYMERS, vol. 61, no. 3, 2001, pages 159 - 79
- KORNBERG; BAKER: "DNA Replication, 2d Ed.", 1992, FREEMAN
- LAGOS-QUINTANA ET AL., SCIENCE, vol. 294, no. 5543, 2001, pages 853 - 858
- LAU ET AL., SCIENCE, vol. 294, no. 5543, 2001, pages 858 - 862
- LEE; AMBROS, SCIENCE, vol. 294, no. 5543, 2001, pages 862 - 864
- LEE ET AL., EMBO J, vol. 21, 2002, pages 4663 - 70
- LOPES ET AL., INT. J CANCER, vol. 120, no. 11, 2007, pages 2344 - 2352
- LU ET AL., NATURE, vol. 435, no. 7043, 2005, pages 834 - 838
- MONTI ET AL., VIRCHOWS ARCH., vol. 445, no. 3, 2004, pages 236 - 247
- OLSEN ET AL., DEV. BIOL., vol. 216, 1999, pages 671
- SAMBROOK ET AL.: "DNA microaarays: a molecular cloning manual", 2003, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS
- SAMBROOK ET AL.: "Molecular cloning: a laboratory manual, 2d Ed.", 1989, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS
- SAMBROOK ET AL.: "Molecular cloning: a laboratory manual, 3rd Ed.,", 2001, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS
- SEGGERSON ET AL., DEV. BIOL., vol. 243, 2002, pages 215
- SHIMZU ET AL., ARCH. PATHOL. LAB. MED., vol. 114, no. 2, 1990, pages 195 - 200
- XU ET AL., CURR. BIOL., vol. 13, 2003, pages 790 - 795
Citation (search report)
- [X] US 2006185027 A1 20060817 - BARTEL DAVID [US], et al
- [XY] HOUBAVIY HRISTO B ET AL: "Embryonic stem cell-specific microRNAs", DEVELOPMENTAL CELL, CELL PRESS, US, vol. 5, no. 2, 1 August 2003 (2003-08-01), pages 351 - 358, XP002540101, ISSN: 1534-5807, DOI: 10.1016/S1534-5807(03)00227-2
- [Y] VOLINIA STEFANO ET AL: "A microRNA expression signature of human solid tumors defines cancer gene targets", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, vol. 103, no. 7, 14 February 2006 (2006-02-14), pages 2257 - 2261, XP002608380, ISSN: 0027-8424, [retrieved on 20060203], DOI: 10.1073/PNAS.0510565103
- [XP] SZAFRANSKA A E ET AL: "MicroRNA expression alterations are linked to tumorigenesis and non-neoplastic processes in pancreatic ductal adenocarcinoma.", ONCOGENE 28 JUN 2007 LNKD- PUBMED:17237814, vol. 26, no. 30, 28 June 2007 (2007-06-28), pages 4442 - 4452, XP002675917, ISSN: 0950-9232
- [XP] KUTAY HUBAN ET AL: "Downregulation of miR-122 in the rodent and human hepatocellular carcinomas", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY, WILEY-LISS INC, US, vol. 99, no. 3, 15 October 2006 (2006-10-15), pages 671 - 678, XP002554082, ISSN: 0730-2312, [retrieved on 20060630], DOI: 10.1002/JCB.20982
- [XP] BURMISTROVA O A ET AL: "MicroRNA in schizophrenia: Genetic and expression analysis of miR-130b (22q 11)", BIOCHEMISTRY (MOSCOW), vol. 72, no. 5, May 2007 (2007-05-01), pages 578 - 582, XP002675918, ISSN: 0006-2979, DOI: 10.1134/S0006297907050161
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
Designated extension state (EPC)
AL BA HR MK RS
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 2008036765 A2 20080327; WO 2008036765 A3 20080605; AU 2007299828 A1 20080327; AU 2007299828 B2 20140306; AU 2007299828 C1 20140717; CA 2664383 A1 20080327; CA 2664383 C 20170822; EP 2115138 A2 20091111; EP 2487240 A1 20120815; EP 2487240 B1 20161116; IL 197690 A0 20110801; JP 2010504102 A 20100212; JP 5520605 B2 20140611; US 2009131348 A1 20090521; US 2019330623 A1 20191031
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 2007078936 W 20070919; AU 2007299828 A 20070919; CA 2664383 A 20070919; EP 07842816 A 20070919; EP 12159733 A 20070919; IL 19769009 A 20090319; JP 2009529373 A 20070919; US 201815917935 A 20180312; US 85794807 A 20070919