Global Patent Index - EP 2500227 A3

EP 2500227 A3 2013-09-18 - Device in the roof area of two vehicle sections with a jointed connection for limiting the angle of the vehicle sections relative to each other

Title (en)

Device in the roof area of two vehicle sections with a jointed connection for limiting the angle of the vehicle sections relative to each other

Title (de)

Im Dachbereich zweier gelenkig miteinander verbundener Fahrzeugteile angeordnete Vorrichtung zur Begrenzung der Wankbewegung der Fahrzeugteile relative zueinander

Title (fr)

Dispositif agencé dans la zone de toit de deux éléments de véhicule reliés de manière articulée, destiné à la limitation du mouvement de basculement des éléments de véhicule les uns par rapport aux autres

Publication

EP 2500227 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 11003355 A

Priority

DE 202011004040 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2500227A2] The mutually connected device (2 to 6) is arranged on the roof area of a vehicle in a hinged manner. Two supports are designed, where each support is arranged at the roof area of the vehicle. A coupling arm is arranged between the supports. A tension element has a spring element, where a bearing block forms the stop of the spring element.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61G 5/02 (2006.01); B61D 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61G 5/02 (2013.01); B61D 3/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

DE 202011004040 U1 20110519; EP 2500227 A2 20120919; EP 2500227 A3 20130918; EP 2500234 A2 20120919; EP 2500234 A3 20130918; EP 2500234 B1 20141001; ES 2523880 T3 20141202

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RICHTER, OLAF

2017-03-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BAAKE, ACHIM

2013-10-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20130909

2013-10-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2013-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2013-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: BA ME

2013-09-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B61D 3/10 20060101ALI20130814BHEP

2013-09-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B61G 5/02 20060101AFI20130814BHEP

2012-12-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BAAKE, ACHIM

2012-12-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RICHTER, OLAF

2012-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2012-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: BA ME