Global Patent Index - EP 2500400 B8

EP 2500400 B8 2017-10-25 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING HYDROCARBON OIL

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR PRODUCING HYDROCARBON OIL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KOHLENWASSERSTOFFÖL

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'HUILE HYDROCARBONÉE

Publication

EP 2500400 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 10828213 A

Priority

  • JP 2009256123 A
  • JP 2010068916 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2500400A1] A hydrocracking process for a wax fraction that includes a wax fraction hydrocracking step of hydrocracking a wax fraction contained within liquid hydrocarbons synthesized by a Fischer-Tropsch synthesis reaction, thereby obtaining a hydrocracked product, a fractional distillation step of supplying the hydrocracked product to a fractionator in which a bottom cut temperature is set to a constant value, and obtaining at least a middle distillate and a bottom oil from the fractionator, a recycling step of resupplying all of the bottom oil to the wax fraction hydrocracking step, and a hydrocracking control step of controlling the wax fraction hydrocracking step using a flow rate of the bottom oil as an indicator.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10G 47/36 (2006.01); C10G 2/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 47/36 (2013.01); C10G 2/32 (2013.01); C10G 2300/1022 (2013.01); C10G 2300/4081 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

EP 2500400 A1 20120919; EP 2500400 A4 20141224; EP 2500400 B1 20170906; EP 2500400 B8 20171025; AU 2010316361 A1 20120531; AU 2010316361 B2 20131205; CA 2779876 A1 20110512; CA 2779876 C 20141209; CN 102597178 A 20120718; CN 102597178 B 20150722; EA 026920 B1 20170531; EA 201290290 A1 20121228; JP 5443508 B2 20140319; JP WO2011055653 A1 20130328; MY 160874 A 20170331; US 2012232172 A1 20120913; WO 2011055653 A1 20110512; ZA 201203241 B 20130731

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170906

2018-05-31 [PG25 SM] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SM

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170906

2018-05-31 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170906

2018-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170906

2018-05-31 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170906

2018-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170906

2018-05-31 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180106

2018-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2018-04-30 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170906

2018-04-30 [PG25 PL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170906

2018-04-30 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170906

2018-02-28 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170906

2018-02-28 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171206

2018-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170906

2018-02-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171207

2018-02-28 [PG25 RS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170906

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171025

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171027

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-02-15 [REG AT MK05] REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT

- Document: AT 925918 T

- Effective date: 20170906

2018-01-31 [PG25 HR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170906

2018-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170906

2018-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170906

2018-01-31 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170906

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171027

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-01-31 [PGFP NO] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NO

- Payment date: 20171026

- Year of fee payment: 8

2018-01-29 [REG NO T2] ENTRY OF EP PATENT INTO NATIONAL PHASE OF NORWAY

- Effective date: 20170906

2018-01-25 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2017-10-26 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602010045123

2017-10-18 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: JAPAN PETROLEUM EXPLORATION CO., LTD.

2017-10-18 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: COSMO OIL CO., LTD.

2017-10-18 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: JXTG NIPPON OIL & ENERGY CORPORATION

2017-10-18 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: NIPPON STEEL & SUMIKIN ENGINEERING CO., LTD.

2017-10-18 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: JAPAN OIL, GAS AND METALS NATIONAL CORPORATION

2017-10-18 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: INPEX CORPORATION

2017-10-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2017-10-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602010045123

- Representative's name: VOSSIUS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELT, DE

2017-09-20 [REG NL FP] TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)

2017-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-09-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 925918 T

- Effective date: 20170915

2017-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME

2017-09-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2017-08-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: JX NIPPON OIL & ENERGY CORPORATION

2017-08-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NIPPON STEEL & SUMIKIN ENGINEERING CO., LTD.

2017-08-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: JAPAN PETROLEUM EXPLORATION CO., LTD.

2017-08-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: INPEX CORPORATION

2017-08-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: JAPAN OIL, GAS AND METALS NATIONAL CORPORATION

2017-08-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: COSMO OIL CO., LTD.

2017-04-05 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170307

2017-04-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TASAKA, KAZUHIKO

2017-04-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: IWAMA, MARIE

2017-04-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TANAKA, YUICHI

2016-03-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20160226

2014-12-24 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20141124

2014-12-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10G 47/36 20060101AFI20141118BHEP

2014-12-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10G 2/00 20060101ALI20141118BHEP

2012-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2012-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME