Global Patent Index - EP 2500459 B1

EP 2500459 B1 20170920 - Method and device for washing, in particular laundry items

Title (en)

Method and device for washing, in particular laundry items

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Waschen von insbesondere Wäschestücken

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de lavage, en particulier de pièces de linge

Publication

EP 2500459 B1 20170920 (DE)

Application

EP 12001271 A 20120227

Priority

DE 102011013806 A 20110314

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2500459A1] The method involves washing the laundry items with a treating liquid in a rotationally driven drum (12). The treating liquid is discharged on demand from the drum by an outer drum (19) that is assigned to a part of the drum. The treating liquid is filtered outside of the drum and the outer drum during the washing. An independent claim is also included for a device for washing laundry items.

IPC 8 full level

D06F 33/02 (2006.01); D06F 39/10 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP)

D06F 31/005 (2013.01); D06F 39/10 (2013.01); D06F 35/006 (2013.01); D06F 39/083 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

None

Citation (opposition)

Opponent : Jensen GmbH

  • US 2005120758 A1 20050609 - THIES EDWARD L [US], et al
  • US 6167733 B1 20010102 - LEE SANG DAE [KR]
  • US 3734854 A 19730522 - ALTADONNA J
  • "Offenkundige Vorbenutzung durch eine Taktwaschanlage der Einsprechenden vom Typ ?P50-16", MEWA - TEXTIL-MIETSERVICE, January 1999 (1999-01-01), Graz, Österreich
  • FUNKTIONSSCHEMA DER ANLAGE ?P50-16'' FÜR ANGEBOT, 26 October 1998 (1998-10-26)
  • INTERNE KOMPONENTENLISTE FÜR AUFTRAG 1049287, 11 December 1998 (1998-12-11)
  • FINALES FUNKTIONSSCHEMA DER AUSGELIEFERTEN ANLAGE ?P50-16, 21 January 1999 (1999-01-21)
  • GEGENSTROMFILTER GR. 3, 25 April 1997 (1997-04-25), pages 36 - 4107
  • GEGENSTROMFILTER 3-FACH IN DOPPELAUSFÜHRUNG, 11 September 1986 (1986-09-11)
  • "Offenkundige Vorbenutzung durch eine Taktwaschanlage der Einsprechenden vom Typ ?P50-18", FLIEGEL TEXTILSERVICE, January 2010 (2010-01-01), Czarnowo, Polen
  • NACHRÜSTUNG BOGENSIEB UND SCHAUMÜBERLÄUFE FÜR BEREITS EXISTIERENDE WASCHANLAGE VOM TYP ?P50-18, 23 February 2010 (2010-02-23)
  • FUNKTIONSSCHEMA DER ANLAGE ?P50-18, 16 March 2010 (2010-03-16)
  • FOTO DER ANLAGE ?P50-18

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

DOCDB simple family (publication)

EP 2500459 A1 20120919; EP 2500459 B1 20170920; EP 2500459 B2 20210414; DE 102011013806 A1 20120920; US 2012233785 A1 20120920

DOCDB simple family (application)

EP 12001271 A 20120227; DE 102011013806 A 20110314; US 201213419528 A 20120314