Global Patent Index - EP 2502360 A4

EP 2502360 A4 2014-04-16 - ESTIMATING RESIDUAL CARRIER FREQUENCY OFFSET IN AN OFDM SIGNAL

Title (en)

ESTIMATING RESIDUAL CARRIER FREQUENCY OFFSET IN AN OFDM SIGNAL

Title (de)

MESSUNG DES RESTTRÄGERFREQUENZ-OFFSETS IN EINEM OFDM-SIGNAL

Title (fr)

ÉVALUATION DU GLISSEMENT RÉSIDUEL DE LA FRÉQUENCE DE PORTEUSE DANS UN SIGNAL OFDM

Publication

EP 2502360 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 10830988 A

Priority

  • US 62133109 A
  • CA 2010001801 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2011116562A1] A residual carrier frequency offset of a signal received by a receiver, which has a local frequency oscillator that generates a carrier frequency different from a carrier frequency generated by a local frequency oscillator at a transmitter that transmitted the received signal is estimated using first and second channel impulse responses derived from first and second portions of the received signal, an estimated phase difference between the first and second channel impulse responses, and an estimate of the residual carrier frequency offset computed using the estimated phase differences. The residual carrier frequency offset is estimated after most of the carrier frequency offset has been removed from the received signal using conventional means.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 27/00 (2006.01); H04L 27/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 27/2671 (2013.01); H04L 27/0014 (2013.01); H04L 27/266 (2013.01); H04L 27/2675 (2013.01); H04L 27/2695 (2013.01); H04L 2027/003 (2013.01); H04L 2027/0067 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

EPO simple patent family

US 2011116562 A1 20110519; US 8265184 B2 20120911; EP 2502360 A1 20120926; EP 2502360 A4 20140416; US 2012314818 A1 20121213; US 8498354 B2 20130730; WO 2011060532 A1 20110526; WO 2011060532 A8 20120830

INPADOC legal status


2016-09-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160322

2015-12-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20151110

2014-04-16 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20140318

2014-04-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04L 27/26 20060101ALI20140312BHEP

2014-04-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04L 27/00 20060101AFI20140312BHEP

2013-07-19 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1176178

2013-02-27 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2012-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20120514

2012-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR