Global Patent Index - EP 2508953 A3

EP 2508953 A3 2017-10-04 - Chronograph mechanism

Title (en)

Chronograph mechanism

Title (de)

Chronographenmechanismus

Title (fr)

Mécanisme de chronographe

Publication

EP 2508953 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 12002080 A

Priority

CH 6412011 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2508953A2] The mechanism has a chronograph gear train comprising a seconds-counter mobile (1) and a mobile (3) with first precision corresponding to first fraction e.g. tenth, of a second. The gear train has an additional mobile (5) with second precision corresponding to second fraction e.g. hundredth, of second, where the additional mobile is driven by the mobile for the first fraction of second via a backlash compensating mobile (4). An indicator, actuated by the additional mobile, indicates the second fraction of second of measured duration, smaller than the first fraction of second.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04F 7/08 (2006.01); G04B 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04F 7/088 (2013.01); G04B 35/00 (2013.01); G04F 7/00 (2013.01); G04F 7/06 (2013.01); G04F 7/08 (2013.01); G04F 7/0847 (2013.01); G04F 7/0857 (2013.01); G04F 7/0866 (2013.01); G04F 7/0871 (2013.01); G04F 7/0876 (2013.01); G04F 7/0895 (2013.01); G04B 19/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

BA ME

EPO simple patent family

EP 2508953 A2 20121010; EP 2508953 A3 20171004; CH 704775 A2 20121015; CN 102736502 A 20121017; CN 102736502 B 20160713; US 2012257480 A1 20121011; US 9075397 B2 20150707

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20180301

2018-04-11 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2017-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME

2017-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G04B 35/00 20060101ALI20170831BHEP

2017-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G04F 7/08 20060101AFI20170831BHEP

2016-07-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MONTBLANC MONTRE SA

2013-02-01 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1169719

2012-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

2012-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: BA ME