Global Patent Index - EP 2522349 A1

EP 2522349 A1 20121114 - Water-Soluble Anionic Bacteriochlorophyll Derivatives and their Uses

Title (en)

Water-Soluble Anionic Bacteriochlorophyll Derivatives and their Uses

Title (de)

Wasserlösliche anionische Bakteriochlorophyl-Derivate und ihre Verwendungen

Title (fr)

Dérivés de bactériochlorophylles anioniques solubles dans l'eau et leurs utilisations

Publication

EP 2522349 A1 20121114 (EN)

Application

EP 12161201 A 20031117

Priority

  • EP 03773967 A 20031117
  • IL 15290002 A 20021117

Abstract (en)

The invention provides anionic water-soluble tetracyclic and pentacyclic bacteriochlorophyll derivatives (Bchls) containing at least one, preferably two or three, negatively charged groups and/or acidic groups that are converted to negatively charged groups at the physiological pH, preferably Bchls having a group COO - , COS - , S0 3 - , PO 3 2- , COOH, COSH, SO 3 H, and/or PO 3 H 2 bound through an ester or amide bond to one or more of the positions 17 3 ,13 3 , and 3 2 of the tetracyclic or pentacyclic Bchl molecule, for photodynamic therapy and diagnosis.

IPC 8 full level

A61K 31/40 (2006.01); A61K 41/00 (2006.01); A61K 49/00 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP US)

A61F 9/0008 (2013.01 - US); A61K 31/40 (2013.01 - EP US); A61K 41/0071 (2013.01 - EP US); A61K 41/0076 (2013.01 - US); A61K 49/0036 (2013.01 - EP US); A61N 5/062 (2013.01 - US); A61N 5/0624 (2013.01 - US); A61P 13/08 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 27/02 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 31/00 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 31/04 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 31/10 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 31/12 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 33/00 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 35/00 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 35/04 (2018.01 - EP); A61P 43/00 (2018.01 - EP); C07F 1/08 (2013.01 - US); C07F 3/02 (2013.01 - US); C07F 3/06 (2013.01 - US); C07F 13/005 (2013.01 - US); C07F 15/006 (2013.01 - US); C07F 15/0066 (2013.01 - US); C07F 15/045 (2013.01 - US)

Citation (applicant)

  • IL 102645 A 19980222 - YEDA RES & DEV [IL]
  • EP 0584552 A2 19940302 - YEDA RES & DEV [IL]
  • US 5726169 A 19980310 - SCHERZ AVIGDOR [IL], et al
  • US 5955585 A 19990921 - SCHERZ AVIGDOR [IL], et al
  • US 6147195 A 20001114 - SCHERZ AVIGDOR [IL], et al
  • WO 0033833 A1 20000615 - YEDA RES & DEV [IL], et al
  • US 6569846 B1 20030527 - SCHERZ AVIGDOR [IL], et al
  • US 4512762 A 19850423 - SPEARS JAMES R [US]
  • WO 9719081 A1 19970529 - YEDA RES & DEV [IL], et al
  • US 6333319 B1 20011225 - SCHERZ AVIGDOR [IL], et al
  • "Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences", MACK PUBLISHING CO.
  • CHEN Q; HUANG Z; LUCK D; BECKERS J; BRUN PH; WILSON BC; SCHERZ A; SALOMON Y; HETZEL FW.: "Preclinical studies in normal canine prostate of a novel palladium- bacteriopheophorbide (WST09) photosensitizer for photodynamic therapy of prostate cancers", PHOTOCHEM PHOTOBIOL., vol. 76, no. 4, 2002, pages 438 - 45, XP055038742, DOI: doi:10.1562/0031-8655(2002)076<0438:PSINCP>2.0.CO;2
  • KOUDINOVA NV; PINTHUS JH; BRANDIS A; BRENNER O; BENDEL P; RAMON J; ESHHAR Z; SCHERZ A; SALOMON Y.: "Photodynamic therapy with Pd-Bacteriopheophorbide (TOOKAD): successful in vivo treatment of human prostatic small cell carcinoma xenografts", INT J CANCER, vol. 104, no. 6, 2003, pages 782 - 9
  • ROSENBACH-BELKIN, V.; CHEN, L.; FIEDOR, L.; TREGUB, I.; PAVLOTSKY, F.; BRUMFELD, V.; SALOMON, Y.; SCHERZ, A.: "Serine conjugates of chlorophyll and bacteriochlorophyll: Photocytotoxicity in vitro and tissue distribution in mice bearing melanoma tumors", PHOTOCHEM. PHOTOBIOL., vol. 64, 1996, pages 174 - 181
  • SCHREIBER S; GROSS S; BRANDIS A; HARMELIN A; ROSENBACH-BELKIN V; SCHERZ A; SALOMON Y.: "Local photodynamic therapy (PDT) of rat C6 glioma xenografts with Pd-bacteriopheophorbide leads to decreased metastases and increase of animal cure compared with surgery", INT J CANCER., vol. 99, no. 2, 2002, pages 279 - 85, XP055038741, DOI: doi:10.1002/ijc.10299
  • ZILBERSTEIN, J.; SCHREIBER, S.; BLOEMERS, MCWM; BENDEL, P.; NEEMAN, M.; SCHECHTMAN, E.; KOHEN, F.; SCHERZ, A.; SALOMON, Y.: "Antivascular treatment of solid melanoma tumors with bacteriochlorophyll-serine-based photodynamic therapy", PHOTOCHEM. PHOTOBIOL., vol. 73, 2001, pages 257 - 266, XP002515153, DOI: doi:10.1562/0031-8655(2001)073<0257:ATOSMT>2.0.CO;2
  • ZILBERSTEIN, J.; BROMBERG, A.; FRANZ, A.; ROSENBACHBELKIN, V.; KRITZMANN, A.; PFEFERMANN, R; SALOMON, Y.; SCHERZ, A.: "Light-dependent oxygen consumption in bacteriochlorophyll-serine-treated melanoma tumors: On-line determination using a tissue-inserted oxygen microsensor", PHOTOCHEM. PHOTOBIOL., vol. 65, 1997, pages 1012 - 1019

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] WO 0140232 A1 20010607 - YEDA RES & DEV [IL], et al
  • [XY] JP S63196586 A 19880815 - TOYO HAKKA KOGYO KK
  • [XY] US 4656186 A 19870407 - BOMMER JERRY C [US], et al
  • [XY] US 4693885 A 19870915 - BOMMER JERRY C [US], et al
  • [XY] US 4977177 A 19901211 - BOMMER JERRY C [US], et al
  • [X] WO 9732885 A1 19970912 - HEALTH RESEARCH INC [US]
  • [Y] WO 9719081 A1 19970529 - YEDA RES & DEV [IL], et al
  • [Y] DE 4121876 A1 19930114 - SCHEER HUGO [DE], et al
  • [YD] US 6147195 A 20001114 - SCHERZ AVIGDOR [IL], et al
  • [YD] US 5955585 A 19990921 - SCHERZ AVIGDOR [IL], et al
  • [YD] WO 0033833 A1 20000615 - YEDA RES & DEV [IL], et al
  • [Y] WO 9513809 A1 19950526 - CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al
  • [XY] MIRONOV ET AL: "Synthesis and properties of new chlorin and bacteriochlorin photosensitizers", SPIE PROCEEDINGS; PHOTOCHEMISTRY: PHOTODYNAMIC THERAPY AND OTHER MODALITIES, THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING - SPIE, BELLINGHAM, WASHINGTON, USA; BARCELONA, SPAIN, vol. 2625, 31 January 1996 (1996-01-31), pages 23 - 32, XP008155668, ISSN: 0277-786X, DOI: 10.1117/12.230970
  • [X] ANDREI F MIRONOV ET AL: "Synthesis of the first N-hydroxycycloimide in the bacteriochlorophyll a series", JOURNAL OF PORPHYRINS AND PHTHALOCYANINES, BOGNOR REGIS, GB, vol. 6, no. 5, 1 May 2002 (2002-05-01), pages 358 - 361, XP008156379, ISSN: 1088-4246, DOI: 10.1142/S1088424602000427
  • [X] MIRONOV ET AL: "Synthesis of a vinyl-containing analogue of bacteriochlorophyll a", MENDELEEV COMMUNICATIONS, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, GB, vol. 11, no. 6, 1 January 2001 (2001-01-01), pages 205 - 206, XP022529132, ISSN: 0959-9436, DOI: 10.1070/MC2001V011N06ABEH001519
  • [X] SCHOCH S ET AL: "SUBTRATE SPECIFICITY OF OVEREXPRESSED BACTERIOCHLOROPHYLL SYNTHASE FROM CHLOROFLEXUS AURANTIACUS", NATO SCIENCE SERIES, 3: HIGH TECHNOLOGY CHLOROPLAST: FROM MOLECULAR BIOLOGY TO BIOTECHNOLOGY ; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATO ADVANCED RESEARCH WORKSHOP ON THE CHLOROPLAST : FROM MOLECULAR BIOLOGY TO BIOTECHNOLOGY; FROM MOLECULAR BIOLOGY TO BIOTECHNOLOGY,, vol. 64, 1 January 1999 (1999-01-01), pages 213 - 216, XP008156380, ISSN: 1388-6576, ISBN: 0-7923-5576-8
  • [X] BECK J ET AL: "Optically detected magnetic resonance of porphyrin complexes in the bacterium Rhodopseudomonas sphaeroides", ZEITSCHRIFT FUER NATURFORSCHUNG. SECTION C. BIOSCIENCES,, vol. 38C, no. 3-4, 1 January 1983 (1983-01-01), pages 220 - 229, XP008156378, ISSN: 0341-0382
  • [A] SMADAR SCHREIBER ET AL: "Local photodynamic therapy (PDT) of rat C6 glioma xenografts with Pd-bacteriopheophorbide leads to decreased metastases and increase of animal cure compared with surgery", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER, vol. 99, no. 2, 10 May 2002 (2002-05-10), pages 279 - 285, XP055038741, ISSN: 0020-7136, DOI: 10.1002/ijc.10299
  • [A] QUN CHEN ET AL: "Preclinical studies in normal canine prostate of a novel palladium-bacteriopheophorbide (WST09) photosensitizer for photodynamic therapy of prostate cancers.", PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY, vol. 76, no. 4, 1 October 2002 (2002-10-01), pages 438 - 445, XP055038742, ISSN: 0031-8655
  • [T] ALEXANDER BRANDIS ET AL: "Novel water-soluble bacteriochlorophyll derivatives for vascular-targeted photodynamic therapy: synthesis, solubility, phototoxicity, and the effect of serum proteins", PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY, vol. 81, no. 4, 1 January 2005 (2005-01-01), pages 983 - 993, XP055038294, ISSN: 0031-8655, DOI: 10.1562/2004-12-01-RA-389

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK

DOCDB simple family (publication)

WO 2004045492 A2 20040603; WO 2004045492 A3 20040708; AU 2003282354 A1 20040615; AU 2003282354 B2 20090423; AU 2003282354 B8 20090514; AU 2003282354 C1 20091029; BR 0316319 A 20050927; BR PI0316319 B1 20170627; CA 2506296 A1 20040603; CA 2506296 C 20120911; CN 102002048 A 20110406; CN 102002048 B 20121128; CN 1741801 A 20060301; CN 1741801 B 20101222; CY 1115458 T1 20170104; DK 1567147 T3 20140811; EP 1567147 A2 20050831; EP 1567147 A4 20080709; EP 1567147 B1 20140507; EP 2522349 A1 20121114; ES 2489516 T3 20140902; HK 1081858 A1 20060526; HU S1800020 I1 20180528; IL 152900 D0 20030624; IL 168480 A 20150129; JP 2006515836 A 20060608; JP 2011148822 A 20110804; JP 2011162551 A 20110825; JP 4922559 B2 20120425; JP 5555659 B2 20140723; JP 5566945 B2 20140806; LU C00073 I2 20180620; MX PA05005262 A 20050725; NL 300934 I2 20180522; NO 20052925 D0 20050615; NO 20052925 L 20050615; NO 2018012 I1 20180410; NO 2018012 I2 20180410; NO 334978 B1 20140811; NZ 540790 A 20091224; PL 216661 B1 20140430; PL 376734 A1 20060109; PT 1567147 E 20140825; RU 2005118771 A 20060120; RU 2353624 C2 20090427; US 2006142260 A1 20060629; US 2011117029 A1 20110519; US 2013345417 A1 20131226; US 2015238773 A1 20150827; US 2017143988 A1 20170525; US 2020094069 A1 20200326; US 7947672 B2 20110524; US 8461142 B2 20130611

DOCDB simple family (application)

IL 0300973 W 20031117; AU 2003282354 A 20031117; BR 0316319 A 20031117; BR PI0316319 A 20031117; CA 2506296 A 20031117; CN 200380108906 A 20031117; CN 201010526857 A 20031117; CY 141100619 T 20140807; DK 03773967 T 20031117; EP 03773967 A 20031117; EP 12161201 A 20031117; ES 03773967 T 20031117; HK 06102165 A 20060217; HU S1800020 C 20180425; IL 15290002 A 20021117; IL 16848005 A 20050509; JP 2004553058 A 20031117; JP 2011096875 A 20110425; JP 2011096876 A 20110425; LU C00073 C 20180411; MX PA05005262 A 20031117; NL 300934 C 20180426; NO 20052925 A 20050615; NO 2018012 C 20180410; NZ 54079003 A 20031117; PL 37673403 A 20031117; PT 03773967 T 20031117; RU 2005118771 A 20031117; US 201313890126 A 20130508; US 201414504347 A 20141001; US 201715425473 A 20170206; US 201916397515 A 20190429; US 53469205 A 20051109; US 94293810 A 20101109