Global Patent Index - EP 2524948 A4

EP 2524948 A4 20130619 - COLOR TONE CORRECTING AGENT, SQUARYLIUM COMPOUND AND OPTICAL FILTER

Title (en)

COLOR TONE CORRECTING AGENT, SQUARYLIUM COMPOUND AND OPTICAL FILTER

Title (de)

FARBTON-BERICHTIGUNGSMITTEL SQUARYLIUM-VERBINDUNG UND OPTISCHER FILTER

Title (fr)

AGENT DE CORRECTION DE TON DE COULEUR, COMPOSÉ DE SQUARYLIUM ET FILTRE OPTIQUE

Publication

EP 2524948 A4 20130619 (EN)

Application

EP 10843140 A 20101203

Priority

  • JP 2010006804 A 20100115
  • JP 2010071698 W 20101203

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2012197026A1] The present invention provides a color tone correcting agent having suitable heat resistance for use in an optical filter, a novel squarylium compound that is specifically preferable as the color tone correcting agent, and an optical filter including the color tone correcting agent. Specifically, the present invention provides a color tone correcting agent including a squarylium compound represented by the general formula (1), a novel squarylium compound which is represented by the general formula (4) and is preferable as the color tone correcting agent, and an optical filter including the color tone correcting agent. The general formula (1) and (4) are each as defined in the specification.

IPC 8 full level

C09B 23/00 (2006.01); C07D 209/12 (2006.01); G02B 5/22 (2006.01)

CPC (source: EP)

C07D 209/12 (2013.01); C07D 403/08 (2013.01); C09B 57/007 (2013.01); G02B 5/223 (2013.01); G03F 7/105 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XI] GB 2426072 A 20061115 - DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]
  • [I] JP H06263732 A 19940920 - MITSUBISHI CHEM IND
  • [XI] JP H0445160 A 19920214 - MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD
  • [X] WO 9743695 A1 19971120 - MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]
  • [X] EP 0645680 A2 19950329 - EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]
  • [X] KURAMOTO ET AL: "The role of excited singlet molecular oxygen in the photodegradation of functional squarylium dyes", JOURNAL OF THE SOCIETY OF DYERS AND COLOURISTS, SOCIETY OF DYERS AND COLOURISTS. BRADFORD, GB, vol. 106, no. 5-6, 1 May 1990 (1990-05-01), pages 181 - 186, XP009169440, ISSN: 0037-9859, [retrieved on 20081022], DOI: 10.1111/J.1478-4408.1990.TB01256.X
  • [I] LI ET AL: "Large third-order optical nonlinearities of centrosymmetric squaraines with heterocyclic donor groups measured by femtosecond degenerate four-wave mixing technique", CHEMICAL PHYSICS LETTERS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 441, no. 1-3, 31 May 2007 (2007-05-31), pages 123 - 126, XP022100018, ISSN: 0009-2614, DOI: 10.1016/J.CPLETT.2007.04.092
  • [X] PIECHOWSKI A P ET AL: "Desirable Properties of Photovoltaic Dyes", JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, vol. 88, no. 5, 1 January 1984 (1984-01-01), pages 934 - 950, XP002464705, ISSN: 0022-3654, DOI: 10.1021/J150649A020
  • [X] SERGIO TATAY ET AL: "Kinetic competition in liquid electrolyte and solid-state cyanine dye sensitized solar cells", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY, vol. 17, no. 29, 1 January 2007 (2007-01-01), pages 3037, XP055061848, ISSN: 0959-9428, DOI: 10.1039/b703750c
  • See also references of WO 2011086785A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR

DOCDB simple family (publication)

US 2012197026 A1 20120802; US 8759540 B2 20140624; CN 102575107 A 20120711; EP 2524948 A1 20121121; EP 2524948 A4 20130619; JP 2011144280 A 20110728; JP 5535664 B2 20140702; KR 20120124384 A 20121113; TW 201136903 A 20111101; WO 2011086785 A1 20110721

DOCDB simple family (application)

US 201013501168 A 20101203; CN 201080044656 A 20101203; EP 10843140 A 20101203; JP 2010006804 A 20100115; JP 2010071698 W 20101203; KR 20127008308 A 20101203; TW 99143369 A 20101210