Global Patent Index - EP 2527405 B8

EP 2527405 B8 2013-09-25 - Thermoplastic resin composition and resin molded article

Title (en)

Thermoplastic resin composition and resin molded article

Title (de)

Thermoplastische Harzzusammensetzung und Harzformartikel

Title (fr)

Composition de résine thermoplastique et article moulé en résine

Publication

EP 2527405 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 12180662 A

Priority

  • EP 07737017 A
  • JP 2006111289 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2006333A1] The present invention relates to a thermoplastic resin composition which comprises 100 parts by weight of a thermoplastic resin (component A) and 1 to 400 parts by weight of a granular inorganic filler (component B) comprising an inorganic filler having an average particle diameter of 0.01 to 100 µm and a water-soluble polyester resin binder, and having a bulk density of 0.4 to 1.5 g/mL; and a resin molded article obtained by molding the thermoplastic resin composition. The thermoplastic resin composition is improved in various properties such as extrusion moldability, rigidity, impact resistance, thermal stability and hue, and exhibits an excellent balance between these properties.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08L 101/00 (2006.01); C08K 3/32 (2006.01); C08K 5/49 (2006.01); C08K 9/04 (2006.01); C08L 21/00 (2006.01); C08L 69/00 (2006.01); C08L 77/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08L 69/00 (2013.01); C08L 67/02 (2013.01); C08L 77/00 (2013.01); C08K 3/346 (2013.01); C08K 5/49 (2013.01); C08L 21/00 (2013.01); C08L 51/04 (2013.01); C08L 77/02 (2013.01); C08L 2205/02 (2013.01); C08L 2205/03 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08L 67/02 + C08L 2666/18
  2. C08L 67/02 + C08L 2666/02
  3. C08L 69/00 + C08L 2666/18
  4. C08L 69/00 + C08L 2666/02
  5. C08L 77/00 + C08L 2666/18
  6. C08L 77/00 + C08L 2666/02

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 2006333 A1 20081224; EP 2006333 A4 20100526; EP 2006333 B1 20130220; CN 101421357 A 20090429; CN 101421357 B 20111116; CN 102120878 A 20110713; CN 102120878 B 20130306; EP 2527405 A1 20121128; EP 2527405 B1 20130807; EP 2527405 B8 20130925; JP 2007284502 A 20071101; JP 5168812 B2 20130327; US 2010010141 A1 20100114; US 8178608 B2 20120515; WO 2007129437 A1 20071115

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170329

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-08-21 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602007032175

- Effective date: 20140508

2014-07-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20140508

2013-10-02 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602007032175

- Effective date: 20131002

2013-09-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: DSM IP ASSETS B.V.

2013-08-07 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 2006333 P

2013-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2013-02-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C08L 69/00 20060101ALI20130116BHEP

2013-02-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C08L 21/00 20060101ALI20130116BHEP

2013-02-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C08L 77/02 20060101ALI20130116BHEP

2013-02-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C08K 5/49 20060101ALI20130116BHEP

2013-02-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C08K 9/04 20060101ALI20130116BHEP

2013-02-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C08K 3/32 20060101ALI20130116BHEP

2013-02-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C08L 101/00 20060101AFI20130116BHEP

2012-12-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20121112

2012-11-28 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 2006333 P

2012-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE